EP3750393 - THREE-SECTION CROP HEADER WITH DRAPERS AND TOP CROSS AUGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MacDon Industries Ltd. 680 Moray Street Winnipeg Manitoba R3J 3S3 / CA | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rheal, Remillard P.O. Box Box 7 St. Joseph, Manitoba / CA | 02 /
Talbot, Francois R. 94 Sonning Bay Winnipeg, Manitoba R2N 3M5 / CA | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | FARAGO Patentanwälte GmbH Thierschstraße 11 80538 München / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2020/51] | FARAGO Patentanwälte Thierschstraße 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20179163.9 | 10.06.2020 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | CA20193046527 | 13.06.2019 Original published format: CA 3046527 | [2020/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3750393 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3750393 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/14, A01D61/00 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
A01D41/144 (EP,BR);
A01D61/002 (EP,BR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ERNTEVORSATZ MIT DREI ABSCHNITTEN MIT SCHNEIDWERKEN UND OBERER QUERFÖRDERSCHNECKE | [2020/51] | English: | THREE-SECTION CROP HEADER WITH DRAPERS AND TOP CROSS AUGER | [2020/51] | French: | TETE DE RECOLTE À TROIS SECTIONS COMPORTANT DES TABLIERS ET UNE VIS SANS FIN TRANSVERSALE SUPÉRIEURE | [2023/11] |
Former [2020/51] | TÊTE DE RECOLTE À TROIS SECTIONS COMPORTANT DES TABLIERS ET UNE VIS SANS FIN TRANSVERSALE SUPÉRIEURE | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2710879 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 1,9-12 *; | [A]CA2810861 (MACDON IND LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * page 6, line 16 - page 19, line 13 ** figures 3,4 *; | [YD]US2018368320 (SCHULZE SELTING STEPHAN [DE], et al) [YD] 2-4 * figures 2,5,6 * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0046] *; | [XYI]EP3434096 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1,6 * figures 7,8,10,21 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0081] * [Y] 2-4 [I] 5,7,8 | Examination | CA2810861 | by applicant | US7918076 | US2018368320 |