EP3763441 - TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR DIAGNOSTIC SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.08.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T&O LabSystems GmbH & Co. KG Leibnizstraße 7 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states T&O LabSystems GmbH & Co. KG Liebnizstrasse 7 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorenzen, Dave Leibnizstraße 7 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | 02 /
Lorenzen, Tom Leibnizstraße 7 24568 Kaltenkirchen / DE | [2021/02] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hemmer Lindfeld Frese Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/02] | Patentanwälte Vollmann Hemmer Lindfeld Partnerschaft mbB Wallstraße 33a 23560 Lübeck / DE | Application number, filing date | 20179167.0 | 10.06.2020 | [2021/02] | Priority number, date | DE201910210174 | 10.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019210174 | [2021/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3763441 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3763441 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, B01L9/06, A61B50/30, A61B50/31, A61B50/36, B65D30/24, A61B50/00 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
A61B50/31 (EP);
A61B50/30 (EP);
A61B50/36 (EP);
B01L3/50 (EP);
B01L9/06 (EP);
B65D31/147 (EP);
A61B2050/0056 (EP);
A61B2050/3007 (EP);
A61B2050/3011 (EP);
B01L2200/025 (EP);
B01L2200/082 (EP);
B01L2200/141 (EP);
B01L2200/18 (EP);
B01L2300/045 (EP);
B01L2400/043 (EP);
B01L2400/0457 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/28] |
Former [2021/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSPORTSYSTEM FÜR DIAGNOSTISCHE PROBEN | [2021/02] | English: | TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR DIAGNOSTIC SAMPLES | [2021/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT POUR ÉCHANTILLONS DIAGNOSTIQUES | [2021/02] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/28] | 08.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 07.02.2024 | HR | 07.02.2024 | PL | 07.02.2024 | NO | 07.05.2024 | RS | 07.05.2024 | GR | 08.05.2024 | IS | 07.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 07.02.2024 | |
HR | 07.02.2024 | ||
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | HR | 07.02.2024 | |
NO | 07.05.2024 | ||
RS | 07.05.2024 | ||
GR | 08.05.2024 | ||
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 07.05.2024 | |
IS | 07.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 07.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20010412U (REISSWOLF AKTEN UND DATENVERNI [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002088723 (LOWRY JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs 40-46 - pages 1-6 *; | [A]US2012265336 (MALLETT SCOTT R [US], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0191] - [0195]; figures 13-17 *; | [XDI]DE102016108380 (ISG INTERMED SERVICE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XD] 1,12-14 * paragraphs [0023] - [0031]; figures 1-4 * [I] 1-16 | by applicant | DE102016108380 |