EP3751107 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/51] | COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH EXHAUST GAS HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM AND EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY METHOD | ||
[2023/45] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLKSWAGEN AG Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2020/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Semke, Artur Moselstrasse 7 38446 Wolfsburg / DE | 02 /
Carstensen, Asmus Lehmweg 9 38557 Osloß / DE | 03 /
Naumann, Hardy Am Hungermorgen 58 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 04 /
Horn, André Bauerwiese 58 38104 Braunschweig / DE | 05 /
Schulenburg, Thomas Wiesengrund 7 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | 06 /
Maischik, Thomas Brockenblick 15 38173 Sickte / DE | [2020/51] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2020/51] | Application number, filing date | 20179402.1 | 11.06.2020 | [2020/51] | Priority number, date | DE201910115909 | 12.06.2019 Original published format: DE102019115909 | [2020/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3751107 | Date: | 16.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3751107 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F01N5/00, F01N5/02, F02G5/04, F01K23/10 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
F01K23/10 (EP);
F01N3/04 (US);
F01K23/065 (US);
F01N3/0205 (US);
F01N5/02 (EP,US);
F02G1/047 (US);
F02G1/055 (US);
F02G5/04 (EP,US);
F01N2240/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] |
Former [2020/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR MIT ABGASWÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR ABGASWÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2020/51] | English: | INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE HAVING EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY | [2023/45] | French: | MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE AYANT UN SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | [2023/45] |
Former [2020/51] | COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH EXHAUST GAS HEAT RECOVERY SYSTEM AND EXHAUST HEAT RECOVERY METHOD | ||
Former [2020/51] | MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE POURVU DE SYSTÈME DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | Examination procedure | 31.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2005282363 (DENSO CORP) [X] 1-4,12-15 * figures 1-5 * [Y] 5-11; | [X]WO2012125107 (SCANIA CV AB [SE], et al) [X] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2017306806 (KARDOS ZOLTAN [SE], et al) [Y] 5-11 * paragraph [0017]; figures 1,2 * | Examination | US2015000274 | by applicant | DE102010023174 | DE102014016997 | EP3161275 |