EP3922661 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYOXYMETHYLENE POLYOXYALKYLENE COPOLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/50] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [2021/50] | Application number, filing date | 20179673.7 | 12.06.2020 | [2021/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3922661 | Date: | 15.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/26, C08G18/56, C08G2/00 | [2021/50] | CPC: |
C08G18/4866 (EP);
C08G65/2663 (EP,US);
C08G18/56 (EP,US);
C08G2/06 (EP);
C08G2/22 (EP);
C08G65/2609 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYOXYMETHYLEN-POLYOXYALKYLEN-COPOLYMEREN | [2021/50] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF POLYOXYMETHYLENE POLYOXYALKYLENE COPOLYMERS | [2021/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COPOLYMÈRES POLYOXYMÉTHYLÈNE-POLYOXYALKYLÈNE | [2021/50] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2015155094 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) | by applicant | US3404109 | US3436375 | US3829505 | US3941849 | WO8101712 | US5158922 | US5470813 | EP0700949 | EP0743093 | EP0761708 | WO9740086 | WO9816310 | JP2928823B | WO0047649 | WO0139883 | WO0180994 | JP3263454B | EP1359177 | US7304172 | JP4145123B | US2012165549 | WO2015155094 | WO2020083814 | EP20180207740 | WO2019EP81407 |