EP3770373 - ASSEMBLY UNIT AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING A BOX FOR RECEIVING A ROLLER SHUTTER OR A SUNSHADE ON A WINDOW FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHÜCO International KG Karolinenstrasse 1 - 15 33609 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÜWE, Timo Detmolder Straße 60 33604 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
BÜSCHER, Christian Pestalozzistr. 13 33615 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Dantz, Jan Henning, et al Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Zwinger 2 33602 Bielefeld / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 20179987.1 | 15.06.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | DE201910120197 | 25.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019120197 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770373 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/17, E06B3/263 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
E06B9/1703 (EP);
E06B9/17023 (EP);
E06B2009/17069 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES KASTENS ZUR AUFNAHME EINES ROLLLADENS ODER EINES SONNENSCHUTZES AN EINEM BLENDRAHMEN | [2021/04] | English: | ASSEMBLY UNIT AND METHOD FOR MOUNTING A BOX FOR RECEIVING A ROLLER SHUTTER OR A SUNSHADE ON A WINDOW FRAME | [2021/04] | French: | UNITÉ DE MONTAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE MONTAGE D'UNE COFFRE DESTINÉE AU LOGEMENT D'UN VOLET ROULANT OU D'UNE PROTECTION SOLAIRE SUR UN CADRE DE FENÊTRE | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 17.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/01] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0263465 (BESLER ARMIN) [X] 1,2,4-7,11,12 * column 2, lines 10-22; figure 9 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 28; figures 7-9 * [Y] 9; | [XA]DE202007001213U (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,10-12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0021] - [0041]; figure 1 * [A] 9; | [XA]BE901246 (THYSSEN PLASTIK ANGER KG) [X] 1-3,5-8,11 * page 2, line 35 - page 3, line 19; figure 1 * [A] 9; | [XA]EP3336297 (VEKA AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0017] - [0021]; figures 1,2; claims 1,9 * [A] 9; | [Y]GR1006080 (EUROPA PROFIL ALOUMINIO A V E) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [A]EP2354425 (ROLA KATERINS A V E E [GR]) [A] 9 * paragraph [0030]; figure 4 * | by applicant | DE8102063U |