EP3754493 - CONTROL EXECUTION ENVIRONMENT AND CONTAINER BASED ARCHITECTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Intellectual Property-Patent Services 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3 P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCLAUGHLIN, Paul F HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services, 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
FELIX, Joseph HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services, 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
SCHREDER, James M HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services, 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 04 /
WAYNICK, Michael HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Intellectual Property - Patent Services, 115 Tabor Road, M/S 4D3, P.O. Box 249 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Landaubogen 1-3 81373 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20180113.1 | 15.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | US201916446090 | 19.06.2019 Original published format: US201916446090 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754493 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48, G05B19/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/4881 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (CN);
G05B15/02 (US);
G05B19/0428 (EP);
G05B19/418 (EP,CN);
G06F9/445 (US);
G05B2219/33273 (EP);
G06F2009/45562 (CN);
G06F2009/45579 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSAUSFÜHRUNGSUMGEBUNG UND BEHÄLTERBASIERTE ARCHITEKTUR | [2020/52] | English: | CONTROL EXECUTION ENVIRONMENT AND CONTAINER BASED ARCHITECTURE | [2020/52] | French: | ENVIRONNEMENT D'EXÉCUTION DE CONTRÔLE ET ARCHITECTURE À BASE DE CONTENEURS | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9128479 (REICHARD DOUGLAS J [US], et al); | [A]WO2017064560 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]); | [A]US2017357247 (KRISHNAMURTHY ANANTHAPADMANABHA [IN], et al); | [I]US2018259923 (DE RAHUL [IN], et al) |