EP3754708 - VERTICAL MEMORY DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.01.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIM, Sunil 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | Mounteney, Simon James Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20180147.9 | 16.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | KR20190074144 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: KR 20190074144 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754708 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/11573, H01L25/065, H01L27/11582 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
H01L25/0657 (EP);
H10B43/27 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H10B41/41 (CN,US);
H01L23/562 (US);
H01L23/535 (US);
H01L23/585 (EP);
H01L29/40117 (KR);
H01L29/792 (KR);
H10B41/10 (CN);
H10B41/27 (CN,US);
H10B41/35 (US);
H10B43/10 (EP,CN);
H10B43/30 (KR);
H10B43/35 (US);
H10B43/40 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L2225/06527 (EP);
H01L2225/06562 (EP);
H01L2225/06568 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/06] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERTIKALE SPEICHERVORRICHTUNGEN | [2020/52] | English: | VERTICAL MEMORY DEVICES | [2020/52] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE MÉMOIRE VERTICAUX | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/06] | 05.01.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017011996 (LEE DOHYUN [KR], et al); | [XYI]US2017256558 (ZHANG GANG [KR], et al); | [Y]US2019081062 (WADA HIDEO [JP], et al); | [A]US2019172840 (SONG MIN SUNG [KR], et al) |