EP3766343 - NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING AN ENGINEERED IMMUNOGLOBULIN LAMBDA LIGHT CHAIN LOCUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Chunguang c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Faith c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 03 /
VORONINA, Vera c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 04 /
MCWHIRTER, John c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 05 /
LEVENKOVA, Natasha c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 06 /
MACDONALD, Lynn c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 07 /
TU, Naxin c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | 08 /
MURPHY, Andrew J c/o Regeneron Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/03] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 20180508.2 | 03.11.2017 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | US201662417845P | 04.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662417845 P | US201762567932P | 04.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762567932 P | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3766343 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3766343 | Date: | 11.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C12N15/90, C12N15/85, C07K16/00 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
A01K67/0278 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,CN,IL,RU,US);
C07K16/18 (KR);
C12N15/8509 (CN,KR);
C12N15/907 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A01K2207/15 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/05 (CN,KR,US);
A01K2217/072 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2217/075 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A01K2267/01 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N2015/8518 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N2800/107 (CN);
C12N2800/30 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 15.07.2021 | ME | 15.07.2021 | Validation states | MA | 15.07.2021 | MD | 15.07.2021 | Title | German: | NICHTHUMANE TIERE MIT MANIPULIERTEM IMMUNGLOBULIN-LAMBDA-LEICHTKETTEN-LOCUS | [2021/03] | English: | NON-HUMAN ANIMALS HAVING AN ENGINEERED IMMUNOGLOBULIN LAMBDA LIGHT CHAIN LOCUS | [2021/03] | French: | ANIMAUX NON HUMAINS AYANT UN LOCUS À CHAÎNE LÉGÈRE LAMBDA D'IMMUNOGLOBULINE MODIFIÉE | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 15.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17863293.1 / EP3407709 | Divisional application(s) | EP22164751.4 / EP4082334 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013096142 (REGENERON PHARMA [US]) [A] 1-14* page 73 - page 106; figure 23B *; | [X]US2014283150 (BRADLEY ALLAN [GB], et al) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0100] * * paragraph [0385] - paragraph [0387] * * paragraph [1200] - paragraph [1237] * * claims 7-13 * | by applicant | US5670356 | US5874304 | WO0236789 | US2002088016 | US6586251 | US6596541 | US2003217373 | US6998514 | US7105348 | US7435871 | US7582298 | US2011236378 | US2013096287 | US8502018 | US8642835 | US8697940 | US8791323 | US2014235933 | US9006511 | US9012717 | US9029628 | US9035128 | US2015159174 | US9066502 | US9150662 | US9163092 | US2015376650 | US2015376628 | US9228208 | US2016060657 | US2016145646 | US2016177339 | - GONNET, G.H. et al., Science, (19920000), vol. 256, pages 1443 - 1445 | - BRUGGEMANN, M. et al., Proc. Nat. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19890000), vol. 86, pages 67 - 09,13 | - GREEN, L.L. et al., Nat. Genet., (19940000), vol. 7, pages 13 - 21 | - HOOGENBOOM, H. R., TIB Tech., (19970000), vol. 15, pages 62 - 70 | - AZZAZY, H.W.E. HIGHSMITH, Clin. Biochem., (20020000), vol. 35, pages 425 - 45 | - GAVILONDO, J. V.J.W. LARRICK, BioTechniques, (20020000), vol. 29, pages 128 - 45 | - HOOGENBOOM H.P. CHAMES, Immunol. Today, (20000000), vol. 21, pages 364 - 70 | - TAYLOR, L. D. et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 6287 - 6295 | - KELLERMANN, S-A.L.L. GREEN, Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 13, pages 593 - 7 | - OSBORN, M.J. et al., J. Immunol., (20130000), vol. 190, pages 1481 - 90 | - LEE, E-C. et al., Nat. Biotech., (20140000), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 356 - 63 | - MACDONALD, L.E. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (20140000), vol. 111, no. 14, pages 5153 - 5158 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, no. 3, pages 403 - 10 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F. et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19960000), vol. 266, pages 460 - 80 | - ALTSCHUL, S.F. et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 402 | - GREEN, L.L. et al., J. Exp. Med., (19980000), vol. 188, pages 483 - 95 | - BRUGGEMANN, M. et al., Arch. Immunol. Ther. Exp., (20150000), vol. 63, pages 101 - 8 | - BRUGGEMANN, M. et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19910000), vol. 21, pages 1323 - 6 | - DAVIES, N.P. et al., Biotechnol., (19930000), vol. 11, pages 911 - 4 | - LONBERG, N. et al., Nature, (19940000), vol. 368, pages 856 - 9 | - TAYLOR, L.D. et al., Int. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 6, pages 579 - 91 | - WAGNER, S.D. et al., Eur. J. Immunol., (19940000), vol. 24, pages 2672 - 81 | - FISHWILD, D.M. et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (19960000), vol. 14, pages 845 - 51 | - WAGNER, S.D. et al., Genomics, (19960000), vol. 34, pages 213 - 218 | - MENDEZ, M.J. et al., Nat. Genet., (19970000), vol. 15, pages 146 - 56 | - XIAN, J. et al., Transgenics, (19980000), vol. 2, pages 333 - 43 | - KELLERMANN, S.A.L.L. GREEN, Cur. Opin. Biotechnol., (20020000), vol. 13, pages 593 - 7 | - NICHOLSON, I.C. et al., J. Immunol., (19990000), vol. 163, pages 6898 - 906 | - POPOV, A.V. et al., J. Exp. Med., (19990000), vol. 189, no. 10, pages 1611 - 19 | - SHIZUYA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 8794 - 8797 | - SWIATEK et al., Genes and Development, (19930000), vol. 7, pages 2071 - 2084 | - OSOEGAWA, K. et al., Genome Res., (20010000), vol. 11, no. 3, pages 483 - 96 | - OSOEGAWA, K. et al., Genomics, (19980000), vol. 52, pages 1 - 8 | - DUNHAM, I. et al., Nature, (19990000), vol. 402, pages 489 - 95 | - POPOV, A.V. et al., Gene, (19960000), vol. 177, pages 195 - 201 | - Molecular Biology of B Cells, Elsevier Academic Press, (20040000), pages 37 - 59 | - AUERBACH, W. et al., Biotechniques, (20000000), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 1024 - 1028,1030,1032 | - MENDEZ, M.J. et al., Nat. Genetics, (19970000), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 146 - 56 | - JAKOBOVITS, A. et al., Ann. NY Acad. Sci., (19950000), vol. 764, pages 525 - 35 | - RAJEWSKI, K. et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19960000), vol. 98, no. 3, pages 600 - 3 | - ORBAN, P.C. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 6861 - 5 | - O'GORMAN, S. et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 251, pages 1351 - 5 | - FESTING et al., Mammalian Genome, (19990000), vol. 10, page 836 | - VALENZUELA et al., Nature Biotech., (20030000), vol. 21, no. 6, pages 652 - 9 | - ASENBAUER, H.H.G. KLOBECK, Eur. J. Immunol., (19960000), vol. 26, no. 1, pages 142 - 50 | - LAKSO, M. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19920000), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6 | - GU, H. et al., Cell, (19930000), vol. 73, no. 6, pages 1155 - 64 | - ARAKI, K. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19950000), vol. 92, pages 160 - 4 | - DYMECKI, S.M., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19960000), vol. 93, no. 12, pages 6191 - 6 | - DECHIARA, T.M. et al., Methods Enzymol., (20100000), vol. 476, pages 285 - 294 | - DECHIARA, T.M., Methods Mol. Biol., (20090000), vol. 530, pages 311 - 324 | - POUEYMIROU et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 25, pages 91 - 99 |