EP3731490 - AUTHENTICATION AND KEY AGREEMENT WITH PERFECT FORWARD SECRECY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.09.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALANIGOUNDER, Anand 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/44] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20180697.3 | 03.03.2016 | [2020/44] | Priority number, date | US201562140331P | 30.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562140331 P | US201562140426P | 30.03.2015 Original published format: US 201562140426 P | US201514825988 | 13.08.2015 Original published format: US201514825988 | [2020/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3731490 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3731490 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/40, H04W12/06, H04W12/041, H04W12/0431, H04W12/0433, H04L9/08, H04L9/32 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H04L9/0841 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/067 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L63/0428 (KR,US);
H04L63/0869 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04L9/085 (KR,US);
H04L9/0891 (EP,KR,US);
H04L9/3066 (KR,US);
H04L9/3242 (EP,KR,US);
H04W12/04 (CN);
H04W12/041 (EP,US);
H04W12/0431 (EP,US);
H04W12/0433 (EP,US);
H04W12/068 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/44] | H04L29/06, H04W12/04, H04L9/08, H04L9/32, H04W12/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2020/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG UND SCHLÜSSELVEREINBARUNG MIT PERFEKTER VORWÄRTSSICHERHEIT | [2020/44] | English: | AUTHENTICATION AND KEY AGREEMENT WITH PERFECT FORWARD SECRECY | [2020/44] | French: | AUTHENTIFICATION ET VALIDATION DE CLÉ À CONFIDENTIALITÉ DE TRANSMISSION PARFAITE | [2020/44] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 17.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16714086.2 / EP3278530 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2013243194 (HAWKES PHILIP MICHAEL [AU], et al); | by applicant | US4200770 |