EP3925502 - DUST COLLECTION DEVICE FOR A MACHINE TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2022 [2022/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plank, Uto 85354 Freising / DE | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20180797.1 | 18.06.2020 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925502 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47L7/00, A47L9/20, B23Q11/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A47L7/0095 (EP,US);
A47L9/106 (US);
A47L9/20 (EP,US);
B23Q11/0071 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAUBSAMMELVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE WERKZEUGMASCHINE | [2021/51] | English: | DUST COLLECTION DEVICE FOR A MACHINE TOOL | [2021/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COLLECTE DE POUSSIÈRE POUR UNE MACHINE-OUTIL | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/50] | 29.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2014061125 (PANASONIC CORP) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0061] - [0062] *; | [A]EP3626391 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] - [0038] *; | [A]US2020156199 (RICHARDS DARYL S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0061] * |