EP3754433 - ASSEMBLY FOR ANCHOR ESCAPEMENT OF TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Manufacture d'Horlogerie Audemars Piguet SA Route de France 16 1348 Le Brassus / CH | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAPI, Giulio Rue de la Prairie 2b 2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | e-Patent SA Rue Saint-Maurice 12 Case postale 2001 Neuchâtel 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2020/52] | e-Patent SA Rue Saint-Honoré 1 Boîte Postale CP 2510 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 20180912.6 | 18.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | CH20190000832 | 19.06.2019 Original published format: CH 8322019 | [2020/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754433 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04B15/14, G04B15/08 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G04B15/14 (EP,CN,US);
G04B15/08 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINHEIT FÜR ANKERHEMMUNG EINES UHRWERKMECHANISMUS | [2020/52] | English: | ASSEMBLY FOR ANCHOR ESCAPEMENT OF TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT | [2020/52] | French: | ENSEMBLE POUR ECHAPPEMENT A ANCRE DE MOUVEMENT HORLOGER | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 21.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH2209 (MARCKWALD LUDWIG [DE]); | [AD]CH44855 (DEBELY EDMOND [CH]); | [XI]DE867671 (EBAUCHES SA); | [A]CH567293 (FAR FAB ASSORTIMENTS REUNIES); | [A]CH699273 (PATEK PHILIPPE SA [CH]); | [A]US2010208555 (HIRAOKA MASASHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | CH44855 | EP2924517 |