EP3925633 - IRRADIATION DEVICE FOR UV IRRADIATION OF A FLOWING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.01.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virobuster International GmbH Köhlershohner Strasse 60 53578 Windhagen / DE | [2021/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fehmi, Yigit 48599 Gronau / DE | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Weidener, Jörg Michael Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2021/51] | Application number, filing date | 20181097.5 | 19.06.2020 | [2021/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3925633 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61L9/20, C02F1/32, F21V7/00 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
A61L9/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/325 (EP,US);
A61L2209/14 (EP,US);
A61L2209/15 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP);
C02F2201/3222 (EP,US);
C02F2201/3228 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/09] |
Former [2021/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTRAHLUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR UV-BESTRAHLUNG EINES STRÖMENDEN MEDIUMS | [2021/51] | English: | IRRADIATION DEVICE FOR UV IRRADIATION OF A FLOWING MEDIUM | [2021/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RAYONNEMENT DESTINÉ AU RAYONNEMENT UV À UN MILIEU EN CIRCULATION | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/09] | 25.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE20021236U (LIFELIGHT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-15 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 *; | [I]EP3111963 (TROJAN TECH INC [CA]) [I] 1-15 * Clause 21; column 21, paragraph 86; figures 1-7,8A,8B,12-16 ** Clauses 62,65, 66; column 28 *; | [I]DE102017117324 (BLOMEIER MAXIMILIAN [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0027] - [0032]; figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2019049129 (HUANG JASON AN-CHENG [TW], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0024] , [0025] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0035]; figures 2,3,4; claim 1 * [I] 9 |