EP3754005 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR REMOVING OR PREVENTING THE APPEARANCE OF FABRIC STAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.2021 [2021/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Molécula Principal - Lda Rua Engenheiro Ferreira Dias, N.º 161, SaLa 103 4100-247 Porto / PT | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SÁ MARTINS, CÉSAR ANDRÉ RUA S. TIAGO Nº 1313, PORTO 4905-016 ALDREU / PT | 02 /
NUNES DA SILVA, RUI PATRÍCIO RUA ENGENHEIRO FERREIRA DIAS, N.º 161, SALA 103 4100-247 PORTO / PT | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20181210.4 | 19.06.2020 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | PT20190115594 | 21.06.2019 Original published format: PT 2019115594 | [2020/52] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754005 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/04, C11D3/08, C11D3/10, C11D3/20, C11D3/36, C11D3/39, C11D11/00, C11D17/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C11D17/0008 (EP);
C11D3/042 (EP);
C11D3/044 (EP);
C11D3/046 (EP);
C11D3/08 (EP);
C11D3/10 (EP);
C11D3/2003 (EP);
C11D3/361 (EP);
C11D3/3942 (EP);
C11D2111/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN ODER VERHINDERN DES ERSCHEINENS VON FLECKEN IN STOFF | [2020/52] | English: | COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR REMOVING OR PREVENTING THE APPEARANCE OF FABRIC STAINS | [2020/52] | French: | COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ENLEVER OU PRÉVENIR L'APPARENCE DE TACHES DE TISSU | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/48] | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0953631 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [X] 1-6,10,13 * paragraph [0001]; examples 1,4; table 3 * [Y] 15 [I] 7,11; | [YD]WO2012016829 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE], et al) [YD] 15 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 4 * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 ** page 7, paragraph 1 - page 8, paragraph l; examples E1-E4 *; | [XYI]DE102011085638 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 13] - [0018] - [0021] , [0022] , [0081]; examples E1, E2; table 1 * [Y] 15 [I] 3,7,8,11; | [Y]DE102015215591 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0 10] , [0 23] - [0028] - [0042] , [0115] - [0118]; example E1; table 1 *; | [XYI]WO2017102868 (HENKEL AG & CO KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,10-14 * page 1, paragraph 1; tables 4-6 * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * * page 4, paragraph 7 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph l - page 9, paragraph 4; claim - * [Y] 15 [I] 3,5,7-9 | by applicant | JPS598471B | CN1041178 | CN1046569 | DE19724106 | CN1209450C | US2011271458 | CN102395348 | US8268769 | US2012304397 | US2013117946 | CN104059782 | CA2813508 | CN104277937 |