Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
02.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.11.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
27.11.2020 | Request for examination filed | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] |
24.06.2020 | Change - representative |