Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11682761 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2023 | B2 | US2020411855 | 31.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019121517 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7109723B | Global Dossier | 01.08.2022 | B2 | JP2021008368 | 28.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019121517 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112142126 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2019121517 | 28.06.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3757068 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019121517 | 28.06.2019 |