EP3757068 - NICKEL HYDROXIDE, POSITIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL, ALKALINE BATTERY, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING NICKEL HYDROXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho TOYOTA-SHI, AICHI-KEN 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states National Research Council of Canada 1200 Montreal Road Ottawa, Ontario K1A 0R6 / CA | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI, Kenji c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
BOCK, Christina 19 Chemin Carnochan Chelsea, Québec J9B 2L6 / CA | 03 /
EBRAHIMI, Nafiseh 1890 Des Prairies Ave Orléans, Ontario K1E 2R4 / CA | 04 /
NABOKA, Olga 625 Monardia Way Orléans, Ontario K4A 1C8 / CA | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 20181895.2 | 24.06.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | JP20190121517 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: JP 2019121517 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757068 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01G53/04, H01M4/00 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C01G53/04 (EP,CN,US);
H01M4/52 (EP,CN,US);
C01B25/45 (US);
C01B35/128 (US);
C07C55/22 (US);
H01B1/06 (US);
H01M10/30 (CN,US);
H01M4/5825 (US);
H01M4/60 (US);
C01P2002/08 (EP);
C01P2002/22 (EP,US);
C01P2002/88 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NICKELHYDROXID, POSITIVES ELEKTRODENMATERIAL, ALKALISCHE BATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON NICKELHYDROXID | [2021/01] | English: | NICKEL HYDROXIDE, POSITIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL, ALKALINE BATTERY, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING NICKEL HYDROXIDE | [2021/01] | French: | HYDROXYDE DE NICKEL, MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE POSITIVE, BATTERIE ALCALINE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROXYDE DE NICKEL | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 29.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0388808 (INCO LTD [CA]) [X] 1-3,5,8-11,13-15,17 * example -; table - * [I] 4,12; | [I]US6019955 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R [US], et al) [I] 1-19* column 7 - column 9; claim - *; | [XI] - TOMOHITO KAMEDA ET AL, "Ni Al layered double hydroxides modified with citrate, malate, and tartrate: Preparation by coprecipitation and uptake of Cufrom aqueous solution", JOURNAL OF PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY OF SOLIDS, PERGAMON PRESS, LONDON, GB, vol. 72, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.JPCS.2011.03.003, ISSN 0022-3697, (20110302), pages 846 - 851, (20110311), XP028211423 [X] 1-4,7,10,11,13-16,19 * page 847 - page 850; figure -; table - * [I] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpcs.2011.03.003 | [X] - DAS J ET AL, "Adsorption of phosphate by layered double hydroxides in aqueous solutions", APPLIED CLAY SCIENCE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 32, no. 3-4, doi:10.1016/J.CLAY.2006.02.005, ISSN 0169-1317, (20060501), pages 252 - 260, (20060501), XP028055207 [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13,17-19 * page 253 - page 259; figure -; table - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.clay.2006.02.005 | [XI] - ROJAS R ET AL, "LAYERED NI(II)-ZN(II) HYDROXYACETATES. ANION EXCHANGE AND THERMAL DECOMPOSITION OF THE HYDROXYSALTS OBTAINED", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, GB, (20020101), vol. 12, no. 4, doi:10.1039/B110145E, ISSN 0959-9428, pages 1071 - 1078, XP008024986 [X] 1-3,5,6,10-15,17,18 * page 1072 - page 1077; figure -; table - * [I] 4,7,16,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b110145e | [XI] - WANG ET AL, "Synthesis and characterization of a layered double hydroxide containing an intercalated nickel(II) citrate complex", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, ELSEVIER SA, SWITZERLAND, TAIWAN, REPUBLIC OF CHINA, (20070605), vol. 104, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MATCHEMPHYS.2007.02.098, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 133 - 140, XP022104405 [X] 1-4,10,11,13-16 * page 134 - page 139; figure -; table - * [I] 12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchemphys.2007.02.098 | [XI] - MAKI HIDESHI ET AL, "Anion-exchange properties of nickel-aluminum layered double hydroxide prepared by liquid phase deposi", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS, ELSEVIER SA, SWITZERLAND, TAIWAN, REPUBLIC OF CHINA, (20130606), vol. 141, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.MATCHEMPHYS.2013.05.043, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 445 - 453, XP028576742 [X] 1-3,7-9 * page 445 - page 453; figure -; table - * [I] 5,10-19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.matchemphys.2013.05.043 | by applicant | JP2010153261 | JP2019121517 |