EP3929838 - ROAD CARGO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD USING PLATE NUMBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenboom, Hendrik Luidpoldstr. 32 86157 Augsburg / DE | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/52] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/52] | Application number, filing date | 20182356.4 | 25.06.2020 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929838 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q50/28 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0833 (EP);
G06Q10/08 (EP);
G06Q10/0835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRASSENLASTKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON NUMMERNSCHILDERN | [2021/52] | English: | ROAD CARGO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD USING PLATE NUMBERS | [2021/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION DE TRANSPORT ROUTIER ET PROCÉDÉ UTILISANT DES NUMÉROS DE PLAQUE | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/49] | 20.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2022 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2757533 (ASELSAN ELEKTRONIK SANAYI VE TICARET ANONIM SIRKETI [TR]); | [IY]US2017372262 (HANEY ROBERT RAY [US]); | [A]US2020193369 (NEGRIN ELISBEL SOLER [US], et al) |