EP3929332 - SHIELD BODY SYSTEM FOR A PROCESS FLUID FOR CHEMICAL AND/OR ELECTROLYTIC SURFACE TREATMENT OF A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Semsysco GmbH Karolingerstrasse 7C 5020 Salzburg / AT | [2021/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖTZLINGER, Herbert 5300 Hallwang / AT | 02 /
KOLITSCH-MATALN, Marianne 9500 Villach / AT | 03 /
OKORN-SCHMIDT, Harald 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | 04 /
GLEISSNER, Andreas 9873 Döbriach / AT | [2022/51] |
Former [2022/15] | 01 /
ÖTZLINGER, Herbert 5300 Hallwang / AT | ||
02 /
KOLITSCH, Marianne 9500 Villach / AT | |||
03 /
OKORN-SCHMIDT, Harald 9020 Klagenfurt / AT | |||
04 /
GLEISSNER, Andreas 9873 Döbriach / AT | |||
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
OTZLINGER Herbert 5300 Hallwang / AT | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/35] |
Former [2021/52] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20182378.8 | 25.06.2020 | [2021/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929332 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP3929332 | Date: | 13.04.2022 | [2022/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3929332 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C25D5/02, C25D17/00, C25D21/10, C25D1/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
C25D17/008 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/026 (EP,KR,US);
C25D1/003 (EP,KR);
C25D17/06 (KR);
C25D21/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Title | German: | ABSCHIRMUNGSKÖRPERSYSTEM FÜR EINE PROZESSFLÜSSIGKEIT ZUR CHEMISCHEN UND/ODER ELEKTROLYTISCHEN OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDLUNG EINES SUBSTRATS | [2021/52] | English: | SHIELD BODY SYSTEM FOR A PROCESS FLUID FOR CHEMICAL AND/OR ELECTROLYTIC SURFACE TREATMENT OF A SUBSTRATE | [2021/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CORPS DE BLINDAGE POUR UN FLUIDE DE TRAITEMENT POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE CHIMIQUE ET/OU ÉLECTROLYTIQUE D'UN SUBSTRAT | [2021/52] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 23.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | DK | 30.08.2023 | EE | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | FI | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | IT | 30.08.2023 | LT | 30.08.2023 | LV | 30.08.2023 | NL | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SE | 30.08.2023 | SI | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | PT | 02.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
IT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
EE | 30.08.2023 | ||
ES | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SK | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
PT | 02.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/22] | CZ | 30.08.2023 | |
DK | 30.08.2023 | ||
FI | 30.08.2023 | ||
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RO | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
NL | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
HR | 30.08.2023 | ||
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
LV | 30.08.2023 | ||
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 30.08.2023 | |
LT | 30.08.2023 | ||
SE | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 30.08.2023 | |
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]KR20100037896 (TKC CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-9,13-15 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0014] * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3 [I] 4,10-12; | [XAI]KR20130138448 (ELRA LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-9,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 3 [I] 4,10-12; | [XAI]CN106637331 (DONGGUAN C-RAY AUTOMATION TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5-9,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 3,13 [I] 4,10-12; | [A]GB2570268 (SEMSYSCO GMBH [AT]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | by applicant | DE102010033256 |