EP3756571 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT INCLUDING A BATTERY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ethicon LLC 475 Street C, Suite 401 Los Frailes Industrial Park 00969 Guaynabo / PR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHELTON, IV, Frederick E. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 02 /
ADAMS, Shane R. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Jason L. 4545 Creek Road Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Tunstall, Christopher Stephen Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 20182415.8 | 26.06.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US201916456724 | 28.06.2019 Original published format: US201916456724 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3756571 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/072, H01M2/10, H01M2/20, // A61B17/00, A61B17/29, A61B90/00, A61B17/068, A61B17/115 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A61B50/20 (EP);
A61B17/07207 (EP,CN);
A61B17/0682 (US);
A61B17/072 (US);
A61B17/2833 (US);
A61B17/29 (US);
A61B17/34 (US);
A61B50/33 (EP);
H01M10/488 (EP,CN,US);
H01M50/213 (EP);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/1155 (EP);
A61B17/32 (US);
A61B2017/00017 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00398 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/00407 (EP);
A61B2017/0046 (EP);
A61B2017/00473 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00862 (US);
A61B2017/0688 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07257 (US);
A61B2017/07271 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/07278 (EP);
A61B2017/07285 (EP,CN);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2929 (EP);
A61B2017/2943 (EP);
A61B2017/2946 (EP);
A61B2050/3004 (EP);
A61B2090/034 (EP);
A61B2090/067 (EP);
A61B2090/0811 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0813 (EP);
A61B2090/0814 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT EINER BATTERIEEINHEIT | [2021/01] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT INCLUDING A BATTERY UNIT | [2021/01] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL INCLUANT UNE UNITÉ DE BATTERIE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1813199 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [Y] 5,12,18 * figure 47 * * paragraph [0120] *; | [A]WO2007090025 (STRYKER CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012115007 (FELDER KEVIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2014207124 (ALDRIDGE JEFFREY L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * figures 6,7 ** paragraphs [0065] , [0066] *; | [Y]EP3151308 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY LLC [PR]) [Y] 3,10,16 * figures 1-4, 9-11 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0 36] *; | [Y]EP3187125 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY LLC [PR]) [Y] 7,14,20 * figures 19A, 19B, 23 * * paragraphs [0069] , [0077] *; | [Y]US2017202592 (SHELTON IV FREDERICK E [US], et al) [Y] 4,6,11,13,17,19 * figures 16-19 * * paragraphs [0169] - [0173] *; | [XY]WO2018226945 (STRYKER CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * figures 1-12E * * paragraphs [0077] - [0099] * [Y] 3-7,10-14,16-20 | by applicant | US5403312 | US6978921 | US6988649 | US7000818 | US7044352 | US7143923 | US2007175955 | US7422139 | US7464849 | US7670334 | US2010089970 | US7753245 | US2010264194 | US7845537 | US7980443 | US8210411 | US8220688 | US8308040 | US2012298719 | US8393514 | US8459520 | US8517239 | US8561870 | US8608045 | US8632525 | US8695866 | US8733613 | US2014263552 | US9050083 | US9072535 | US9101358 | US9345481 | US9629629 | US9844369 | US20120893461 | US20080031573 | US20080031873 | US20080235972 | US20080235782 | US20080249117 | US20080343803 | US20090647100 | US20100651807 |