Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3932419 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3932419



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(13)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 67
19.01.2022 Application refused (no designation of inventor filed) Search / examination 2
11.01.2022 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.12.2021 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
20.11.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.11.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 3
20.11.2020 European search report Search / examination 3
20.11.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.07.2020 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
29.06.2020 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.06.2020 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
29.06.2020 Claims Search / examination 5
29.06.2020 Description Search / examination 39
29.06.2020 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5