EP3825469 - GROUT APPLICATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2021/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Flemming Frost Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2021/21] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/21] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 20183547.7 | 01.07.2020 | [2021/21] | Priority number, date | EP20190210793 | 21.11.2019 Original published format: EP 19210793 | [2021/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3825469 | Date: | 26.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3825469 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E02B17/00 | [2021/21] | CPC: |
E02B17/0008 (EP,KR,US);
E02D27/52 (KR,US);
E02B2017/0039 (KR,US);
E02D2250/003 (KR,US);
E02D2250/0061 (KR,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/727 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] |
Former [2021/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FUGENMÖRTELAPPLIKATOR | [2021/21] | English: | GROUT APPLICATOR | [2021/21] | French: | APPLICATEUR DE COULIS | [2021/21] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 01.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4789271 (SULLAWAY BOB L [US], et al); | [X]US2011135401 (HALL RUDOLPH A [US]); | [X]US2013149039 (HAUGSOEEN PER BULL [NO], et al); | [A]CN203238652U (GUANGDONG MINGYANG WIND POWER IND GROUP CO LTD); | [X]CN205046588U (GUANGDONG MINGYANG WIND POWER IND GROUP CO LTD) |