EP3754583 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CARPOOLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Didi Infinity Technology and Development Co., Ltd. Building 34, No. 8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District Beijing 100193 / CN | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huang, Meiling Building 34 No. 8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District, Beijing 100193 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20183582.4 | 21.12.2016 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | CN201610135580 | 08.03.2016 Original published format: CN201610135580 | [2020/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754583 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q10/02, // G06Q50/30, G07C5/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G06Q50/40 (EP,CN,GB,US);
G06Q30/0635 (CN);
G06Q10/02 (EP,GB,US);
G06Q30/06 (EP,US);
G07C5/008 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR FAHRGEMEINSCHAFT | [2020/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CARPOOLING | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COVOITURAGE | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16893329.9 / EP3320514 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004267449 (ADAMCZYK MARIA [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0035]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0047] - [0052]; figure 6 *; | [I]US2009259657 (BALTUS MICHAEL M L [BE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0 24] * * paragraphs [0029] - [0032]; figures 2A-2BB * * paragraphs [0048] - [0055]; figure 3 *; | [I]US2012041675 (JULIVER STEVEN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0048] - [0085]; figure 1 ** paragraphs [0086] - [0125]; figures 3,4 *; | [I]WO2016007857 (PAUL SUNIL [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0022] - [0 33] - [0036]; figure 1 * |