EP3760079 - INSERTING DEVICE AND GOODS PRESENTATION ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roomly GmbH Zeppelinstraße 8-12 88677 Markdorf / DE | [2024/32] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Shop Systems GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 8-10 88677 Markdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Remensperger, Eugen Brandweg 14 72517 Sigmaringendorf / DE | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 20183704.4 | 02.07.2020 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | DE201910118042 | 04.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019118042 | [2021/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760079 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47B96/06, A47F5/08, // A47F11/10 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A47B96/068 (EP);
H01R13/052 (US);
A47F5/0823 (EP);
H01R13/6205 (US);
H01R24/38 (US);
H01R24/86 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] |
Former [2021/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTECKVORRICHTUNG UND WARENPRÄSENTATIONSANORDNUNG | [2021/01] | English: | INSERTING DEVICE AND GOODS PRESENTATION ASSEMBLY | [2021/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE BRANCHEMENT ET AGENCEMENT DE PRÉSENTATION DES PRODUITS | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 02.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE102006037119 (KONRAD KNOBLAUCH VERMOEGENSVER [DE]); | [A]EP2789272 (SHOP SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]); | [X]DE102016113419 (JUVEMA AG [CH]); | [X]DE102016121435 (JUVEMA AG [CH]) |