Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11344178 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2022 | B2 | US2021045615 | 18.02.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017088268 | 03.11.2020 | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | WO2016KR07424 | 08.07.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | US201815741856 | 04.01.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11026556 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2021 | B2 | US2018192847 | 12.07.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | WO2016KR07424 | 08.07.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102468150B | Global Dossier | 18.11.2022 | B1 | KR20170081937 | 13.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102358753B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2022 | B1 | KR20170011114 | 02.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3324812 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2020 | B1 | EP3324812 | 27.03.2019 | A4 | EP3324812 | 30.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | WO2016KR07424 | 08.07.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021202488B | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | B2 | AU2021202488 | 20.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | WO2016KR07424 | 08.07.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | AU2016295058 | 08.07.2016 | AU2021202488 | 23.04.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016295058B | Global Dossier | 04.03.2021 | B2 | AU2016295058 | 07.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | WO2016KR07424 | 08.07.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3747335 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2021 | B1 | EP3747335 | 09.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | WO2016KR07424 | 08.07.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | EP16827966 | 08.07.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017014462 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 | Type | Earlier application | EP3324812 |