EP3747335 - DISHWASHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Jinhong IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Minchul IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Kyuhyung IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 51, Gasan digital 1-ro Geumcheon-gu Seoul 08592 / KR | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/50] | Application number, filing date | 20183896.8 | 08.07.2016 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | KR20150103108 | 21.07.2015 Original published format: KR 20150103108 | KR20160000983 | 05.01.2016 Original published format: KR 20160000983 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3747335 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3747335 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/22, A47L15/42 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
A47L15/4206 (EP,US);
A47L15/4246 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] |
Former [2020/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | GESCHIRRSPÜLER | [2020/50] | English: | DISHWASHER | [2020/50] | French: | LAVE-VAISSELLE | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 09.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16827966.9 / EP3324812 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2016 | AL | 29.09.2021 | AT | 29.09.2021 | CY | 29.09.2021 | CZ | 29.09.2021 | DK | 29.09.2021 | EE | 29.09.2021 | ES | 29.09.2021 | FI | 29.09.2021 | HR | 29.09.2021 | LT | 29.09.2021 | LV | 29.09.2021 | MC | 29.09.2021 | MK | 29.09.2021 | NL | 29.09.2021 | PL | 29.09.2021 | RO | 29.09.2021 | RS | 29.09.2021 | SE | 29.09.2021 | SI | 29.09.2021 | SK | 29.09.2021 | SM | 29.09.2021 | BG | 29.12.2021 | NO | 29.12.2021 | GR | 30.12.2021 | IS | 29.01.2022 | PT | 31.01.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
MK | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
SM | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CY | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
MC | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SI | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
DK | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 29.09.2021 | |
AT | 29.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
NL | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RO | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
IS | 29.01.2022 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
CZ | 29.09.2021 | ||
EE | 29.09.2021 | ||
ES | 29.09.2021 | ||
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
PL | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
SK | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
PT | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 29.09.2021 | |
FI | 29.09.2021 | ||
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
HR | 29.09.2021 | ||
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
LV | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
GR | 30.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
RS | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 29.09.2021 | |
LT | 29.09.2021 | ||
SE | 29.09.2021 | ||
BG | 29.12.2021 | ||
NO | 29.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 29.09.2021 | |
NO | 29.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1202546 (CANDY SPA [IT]) [A] 1* page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0752231 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 31-48; figure - *; | [A]EP0855165 (SMEG SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 14; figure - *; | [A]US2010037923 (DINGLER GEOFFREY L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0023]; figure - *; | [A]US2010252080 (YOON SANG HEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XA]CN202096176U (MIDEA HOLDING CO LTD) [X] 1-4,14 * abstract * [A] 5-13,15; | [A]WO2012085840 (INDESIT CO SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]CN202446037U (HAIER GROUP CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]KR20120129266 (-) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]KR101241871B (LG ELECTRONICS INC.) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | KR20110004578 |