EP3812346 - METHOD FOR PRECISE VOLUME OR MASS-BASED FILLING OF LIQUID PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES AG Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUHBECK, Thomas Böhmerwaldstraße 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 20183977.6 | 03.07.2020 | [2021/17] | Priority number, date | DE201910128322 | 21.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019128322 | [2021/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812346 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/28 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
B67C3/287 (EP);
B65B3/26 (CN);
B65B3/04 (CN);
B65B3/30 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/48] |
Former [2021/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VOLUMEN- BZW. MASSENGENAUEN ABFÜLLUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN PRODUKTEN | [2021/17] | English: | METHOD FOR PRECISE VOLUME OR MASS-BASED FILLING OF LIQUID PRODUCTS | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REMPLISSAGE PRÉCIS AU NIVEAU DE VOLUME OU DE MASSE DE PRODUITS LIQUIDES | [2021/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2021 | Examination requested [2021/48] | 25.10.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0430897 (FARMOMAC SRL [IT]) [X] 1,6,10 * column 1, line 1 - line 54 * * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 6; figure 1 *[I] 5,7-9,14; | [XI]DE102005035264 (FLOWTEC AG [CH]) [X] 1-4,6-13,15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0014] , [0025] , [0028] , [0037] - [0039]; figures 1-4 * [I] 5,14 |