EP3936890 - LIDAR TARGET SIMULATOR, LIDAR TESTING SYSTEM AS WELL AS METHOD OF TESTING A LIDAR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Simper, Benedikt 81671 München / DE | 02 /
Hamberger, Gerhard 81671 München / DE | 03 /
Beer, Matthias 81671 München / DE | 04 /
Neidhardt, Steffen 81671 München / DE | 05 /
Bogner, Maximilian 81671 München / DE | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20184311.7 | 06.07.2020 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936890 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/497, G01S17/10, G01S17/42 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G01S7/497 (EP,US);
G01S17/10 (EP);
G01S17/42 (EP);
G01S17/931 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/17] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LIDAR-ZIELSIMULATOR, LIDAR-TESTSYSTEM SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM TESTEN EINER LIDAR-VORRICHTUNG | [2022/02] | English: | LIDAR TARGET SIMULATOR, LIDAR TESTING SYSTEM AS WELL AS METHOD OF TESTING A LIDAR DEVICE | [2022/02] | French: | SIMULATEUR DE CIBLE LIDAR, SYSTÈME DE TEST LIDAR AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE TESTER UN DISPOSITIF LIDAR | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/17] | 22.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102007057372 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE], et al) [A] 2 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0027] *; | [A]CN109031250 (UNIV NANJING SCI & TECH) [A] 9* abstract; figure 1 *; | [XAI]DE102019106129 (JENOPTIK OPTICAL SYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,13,15 * abstract; figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0017] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraphs [0036] , [0 42] * [A] 10-12 [I] 2,8,9,14 |