EP3936585 - A SOLID POLYMER COMPOSITION, A SELF-SUPPORTING FILM AND A LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.12.2022 [2022/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avantama AG Laubisrütistrasse 50 8712 Stäfa / CH | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜCHINGER, Norman 8706 Meilen / CH | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Rey, Antje Gabriele E. Blum & Co. AG Vorderberg 11 8044 Zürich / CH | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20184584.9 | 07.07.2020 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3936585 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C09K11/56, C09K11/66, C09K11/70, C09K11/88, H05B33/14, H05B33/20, C07F7/24 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C09K11/025 (EP,KR);
C09K11/664 (EP,KR,US);
C07F7/21 (EP,KR);
C07F7/24 (EP,KR);
C08F122/10 (US);
C09K11/06 (US);
C09K11/565 (EP,KR);
C09K11/623 (US);
C09K11/70 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/883 (EP,KR);
C09K19/3838 (US);
H05B33/14 (EP,KR);
H05B33/20 (EP,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, SELBSTTRAGENDE FOLIE UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/02] | English: | A SOLID POLYMER COMPOSITION, A SELF-SUPPORTING FILM AND A LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE | [2022/02] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE SOLIDE, FILM AUTOPORTANT ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/51] | 02.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2022/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2017186922 (KIM TAE HYUNG [KR], et al); | [A]WO2017108568 (AVANTAMA AG [CH]); | [XI]WO2017195062 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]); | [X]WO2018146561 (UNIV KING ABDULLAH SCI & TECH [SA]); | [A]WO2020130592 (SEOUL NAT UNIV R&DB FOUNDATION [KR]) | by applicant | WO2018028869 |