EP3798996 - APPARATUS FOR A CHECKPOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IDEMIA Identity & Security Germany AG Universitätsstrasse 160 44801 Bochum / DE | For all designated states Magnetic Autocontrol GmbH Grienmatt 20 79650 Schopfheim / DE | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAIS, Lothar Am Sturmen 5 79650 SCHOPFHEIM-ENKENSTEIN / DE | 02 /
WENDT, Norbert Ruhrallee 4 45138 ESSEN / DE | 03 /
BRAUCKMANN, Michael Möllerstrasse 11 58456 WITTEN / DE | 04 /
WERNER, Martin Urbecker Strasse 90b 58675 HERNER / DE | 05 /
HOMBERG, Dirk Heinrich-König-Strasse 48a 44797 BOCHUM / DE | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 20184641.7 | 07.01.2009 | [2021/13] | Previously filed application, date | WO2009DE00014 | 07.01.2009 | [2021/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798996 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/10, G07C9/25, G07C9/37, // G07C9/00, G07C9/15 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
G07C9/10 (EP,US);
G07C9/257 (EP,US);
G07C9/37 (EP,US);
G07C9/00944 (EP,US);
G07C9/15 (EP,US);
Y10T70/5199 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR PERSONENDURCHGANGSKONTROLLE | [2021/13] | English: | APPARATUS FOR A CHECKPOINT | [2021/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTROLE DU PASSAGE DE PERSONNES | [2021/13] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09775828.8 / EP2382605 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 08.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 08.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO9906928 (SPRING TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [I] 1,2,4-19 * abstract * * page 3, line 26 - page 26, line 9 * * figures 1-9c * [A] 3; | [A]EP1241633 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0109] - [0118] *; | [A]WO2005119601 (X PIN COM GMBH [AT], et al) [A] 1-19 * abstract ** page 2, line 1 - page 6, line 8 *; | [XAI]DE102004048403 (KABA GALLENSCHUETZ GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0035] * [A] 3 [I] 2,4-7,10-19; | [XAI]DE102006036108 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0050] , [0052] , [0063] , [0064] * * paragraphs [0072] - [0093] * [A] 3 [I] 2,4-11,13,15-19 |