EP3937228 - COOLING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Bruggerstrasse 66 5400 Baden / CH | [2022/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Manninen, Jorma 00380 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
Silvennoinen, Mika 00380 Helsinki / FI | 03 /
Pakarinen, Joni 00380 Helsinki / FI | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Kolster Oy Ab Salmisaarenaukio 1 P.O. Box 204 00181 Helsinki / FI | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20184712.6 | 08.07.2020 | [2022/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3937228 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/427 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H01L23/427 (EP);
H01L23/467 (CN);
H05K7/209 (US);
H01L23/367 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/10] |
Former [2022/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÜHLANORDNUNG | [2022/02] | English: | COOLING ARRANGEMENT | [2022/02] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE REFROIDISSEMENT | [2022/02] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/10] | 28.01.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 16.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN102769001 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [XI]US2018090415 (ESCOBAR-VARGAS SERGIO [US], et al); | [XI]US2019230826 (BOURLIER LUDOVIC [FR], et al) |