EP3753823 - AUXILIARY DRIVE FOR A TRAILER AND TRAILER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reich GmbH Regel- und Sicherheitstechnik Ahornweg 37 35713 Eschenburg-Wissenbach / DE | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENDER, Steffen Scheidstrasse 18 35713 Eschenburg / DE | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 20184779.5 | 18.08.2017 | [2020/52] | Priority number, date | DE201620104710U | 26.08.2016 Original published format: DE 202016104710 U | [2020/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3753823 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D59/04, // B62D25/20 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
B62D59/04 (EP);
B62D25/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] |
Former [2020/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HILFSANTRIEB FÜR EINEN ANHÄNGER UND ANHÄNGER | [2020/52] | English: | AUXILIARY DRIVE FOR A TRAILER AND TRAILER | [2020/52] | French: | ENTRAINEMENT D'ASSISTANCE POUR UNE REMORQUE ET REMORQUE | [2020/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17186806.0 / EP3287347 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE20306487U (GEIGER GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1-8,11,14,15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 25] * [I] 9,10,12,13,16-18; | [A]EP1764274 (PURPLE LINE LTD [GB]) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0034]; figure - *; | [A]EP2138386 (TRUMA GERAETETECHNIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0045]; figure - *; | [A]EP2206641 (REICH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,18* figure -; claim - *; | [A]DE102013107914 (AL KO KOBER SE [DE]) [A] 1,18 * figure -; claim - * |