EP3767329 - APPARATUS COMPRISING ANALOG DELAY CIRCUITS FOR ULTRASOUND IMAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-0036 / JP | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/03] | For all designated states Canon Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-0036 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHITSUKA, Masaaki c/o Canon Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi, 324-0036 / JP | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/09] |
Former [2021/03] | Moreland, David Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 20185004.7 | 09.07.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | JP20190132510 | 18.07.2019 Original published format: JP 2019132510 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767329 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3767329 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52, G01S15/89, G10K11/34 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
G01S7/52026 (EP);
G01S7/52025 (US);
A61B8/5246 (US);
A61B8/5269 (US);
A61B8/54 (US);
G01S15/8915 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG MIT ANALOGEN VERZÖGERUNGSSCHALTUNGEN FÜR DIE ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNG | [2023/18] | English: | APPARATUS COMPRISING ANALOG DELAY CIRCUITS FOR ULTRASOUND IMAGING | [2021/03] | French: | APPAREIL COMPRENANT DES CIRCUITS À RETARD ANALOGIQUE POUR L'IMAGERIE PAR ULTRASONS | [2021/03] |
Former [2021/03] | VORRICHTUNG MIT ANALOGEN VERZÖGERUNGSSCHALTUNGEN FÜR DIE ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNG | Examination procedure | 09.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/03] | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | FI | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | NL | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | SE | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
LV | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
PL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
PT | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
FI | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
NL | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP3111849 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5,7,8,10-12,14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0 39] , [0 43] * * paragraph [0078] * [A] 2-4,6,9,13,15; | [A]US2019008477 (ISHITSUKA MASAAKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0163] * |