EP3787186 - METHOD FOR PACKAGING AN ACOUSTIC FILTER CHIP AND CHIP PACKAGE STRUCTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou JWL Technology Inc. Room 1004, Floor 10, Building 4, No.9 Jiuhuan Road, Jianggan District Hangzhou Zhejiang / CN | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, LINPING Room 1004, floor 10 building 4, No.9 Jiuhuan Road Jianggan District Hangzhou, Zhejiang / CN | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 20185122.7 | 10.07.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | CN201910801551 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910801551 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787186 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H03H9/10, H03H9/05, H03H3/02, H03H3/08, H01L21/56, H01L23/31, H01L23/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
H01L23/3121 (EP);
H01L21/56 (EP,US);
H01L23/315 (EP);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L24/81 (EP,US);
H03H3/007 (CN);
H03H3/02 (EP,US);
H03H3/08 (EP,CN);
H03H9/02 (CN);
H03H9/02535 (CN);
H03H9/1085 (EP);
H03H9/15 (US);
H03H9/25 (CN);
H03H9/54 (US);
H03H9/64 (CN);
H01L2224/0401 (EP);
H01L2224/13101 (EP);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L2224/16227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/73204 (EP);
H01L2224/81191 (EP);
H01L2224/81192 (EP);
H01L2224/81193 (EP);
H01L2224/81801 (EP);
H01L2224/81815 (US);
H01L2224/81951 (US);
H01L2224/94 (EP);
H01L24/13 (EP);
H01L2924/10156 (EP);
H01L2924/10157 (EP);
H01L2924/1421 (EP,US);
H01L2924/146 (EP);
H01L2924/1461 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15159 (EP);
H01L2924/15174 (EP);
H01L2924/15313 (EP);
H01L2924/181 (EP);
H03H2009/02173 (CN);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/13101, H01L2924/014, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73204, H01L2224/16225, H01L2224/32225, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/03 (EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERPACKEN EINES CHIPS MIT AKKUSTISCHEN WELLEN ARBEITEND UND CHIPGEHÄUSESTRUKTUR DAFÜR | [2021/09] | English: | METHOD FOR PACKAGING AN ACOUSTIC FILTER CHIP AND CHIP PACKAGE STRUCTURE THEREOF | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EMBALLAGE D'UNE PUCE D'UN FILTRE ACOUSTIQUE ET STRUCTURE DE BOÎTIER DE PUCE ASSOCIÉE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 18.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004134592 (TOYO COMMUNICATION EQUIP) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0005] - [0009]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004222717 (MATSUDA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraph [0076]; figure 7 * |