EP3789397 - NOVEL SPECIFIC-BINDING POLYPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.01.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pieris Pharmaceuticals GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 3 85399 Hallbergmoos / DE | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINNER, Marlon Eugen Papststrasse 9 81247 Munich / DE | 02 /
WIEDENMANN, Alexander Silcherweg 4 89542 Herbrechtingen / DE | 03 /
ALLERSDORFER, Andrea Mozartstrasse 20A 85283 Wolnzach / DE | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 20185401.5 | 20.05.2015 | [2021/10] | Priority number, date | EP20140169488 | 22.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14169488 | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789397 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3789397 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/00, C07K19/00, A61K38/16, C07K14/54, C07K14/47 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,RU,US);
A61P29/00 (EP,RU);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/54 (KR);
C12P21/02 (RU);
G01N33/6869 (CN,RU,US);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
C07K2319/31 (KR);
G01N2333/47 (CN);
G01N2333/525 (KR);
G01N2333/54 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] |
Former [2021/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE POLYPEPTIDE MIT SPEZIFISCHER BINDUNG UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2021/10] | English: | NOVEL SPECIFIC-BINDING POLYPEPTIDES AND USES THEREOF | [2021/10] | French: | NOUVEAUX POLYPEPTIDES DE LIAISON SPÉCIFIQUE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2021/10] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 09.09.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 26.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15727573.6 / EP3145945 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007149032 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-15 * pages 1,36; claims 51-53 * * pages 58,60; claims 57-59 *; | [A]WO2012156219 (ABLYNX NV [BE], et al) [A] 1-15* pages 80-81, *; | [I] - CHEN YI ET AL, "Anti-IL-23 therapy inhibits multiple inflammatory pathways and ameliorates autoimmune encephalomyelitis", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, B M J GROUP, GB, (20060501), vol. 116, no. 5, doi:10.1172/JCI25308, ISSN 0021-9738, pages 1317 - 1326, XP002583205 [I] 1-15 * page 1317 - page 1326 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/jci25308 | [I] - KIKLY K ET AL, "The IL-23/Th"1"7 axis: therapeutic targets for autoimmune inflammation", CURRENT OPINION IN IMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, vol. 18, no. 6, ISSN 0952-7915, (20061201), pages 670 - 675, (20061201), XP027932748 [I] 1-15 * page 670 - page 675 * | [I] - WEISS G A ET AL, "ANTICALINS VERSUS ANTIBODIES: MADE-TO-ORDER BINDING PROTEINS FOR SMALL MOLECULES", CHEMISTRY AND BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (20000801), vol. 7, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S1074-5521(00)00016-8, ISSN 1074-5521, pages R177 - R184, XP001079019 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-5521(00)00016-8 | [I] - SKERRA A, "'Anticalins': a new class of engineered ligand-binding proteins with antibody-like properties", REVIEWS IN MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010601), vol. 74, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S1389-0352(01)00020-4, ISSN 1389-0352, pages 257 - 275, XP002269554 [I] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-0352(01)00020-4 | [A] - SCHLEHUBER S ET AL, "Anticalins as an alternative to antibody technology", EXPERT OPINION ON BIOLOGICAL THERAPY, ASHLEY, LONDON, GB, (20050101), vol. 5, no. 11, doi:10.1517/14712598.5.11.1453, ISSN 1471-2598, pages 1453 - 1462, XP009101205 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.5.11.1453 | [A] - HOHLBAUM A M ET AL, "Anticalins(R): The lipocalin family as a novel protein scaffold for the development of next-generation immunotherapies", EXPERT REVIEW OF CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, FUTURE DRUGS LTD., LONDON, GB, (20070101), vol. 3, no. 4, doi:10.1586/1744666X.3.4.491, ISSN 1744-666X, pages 491 - 501, XP001538450 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/1744666X.3.4.491 | [A] - SKERRA ARNE, "Anticalins as alternative binding proteins for therapeutic use", CURRENT OPINION IN MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS, CURRENT DRUGS, LONDON, GB, (20070801), vol. 9, no. 4, ISSN 1464-8431, pages 336 - 344, XP009101213 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - ARNE SKERRA, "Alternative binding proteins: Anticalins - harnessing the structural plasticity of the lipocalin ligand pocket to engineer novel binding activities", FEBS JOURNAL, (20080624), vol. 275, no. 11, doi:10.1111/j.1742-4658.2008.06439.x, ISSN 1742-464X, pages 2677 - 2683, XP055099855 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1742-4658.2008.06439.x | by applicant | WO9916873 | WO9964016 | WO0075308 | US6177074 | US6403564 | US6500930 | WO03029463 | WO03029471 | US2003069395 | US6620413 | US6696245 | WO2005019256 | WO2006056464 | WO2007038619 | US7250297 | WO2012004384 | - ROUVIER et al., J. Immunol, (19930000), vol. 150, pages 5445 - 5556 | - YAO et al., Immunity, (19950000), vol. 3, pages 811 - 821 | - YAO et al., J. Immunol, (19950000), vol. 755, no. 12, pages 5483 - 5486 | - FOSSIEZ et al., J. Exp. Med., (19960000), vol. 183, no. 6, pages 2593 - 2603 | - SPRIGGS et al., J. Clin. Immunol, (19970000), vol. 17, pages 366 - 369 | - KOLLS et al., Immunity, (20040000), vol. 21, pages 467 - 476 | - KAWAGUCHI et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol, (20040000), vol. 114, no. 6, pages 1267 - 1273 | - MOSELEY et al., Cytokine Growth Factor Rev., (20030000), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 155 - 174 | - LUBBERTS E., Cytokine, (20080000), vol. 41, pages 84 - 91 | - ANTONYSAMY et al., J. Immunol, (19990000), vol. 162, pages 577 - 584 | - VAN KOOTEN et al., J. Am. Soc. Nephrol., (19980000), vol. 9, pages 1526 - 1534 | - MOLET et al., J. Allergy Clin. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 108, pages 430 - 438 | - TEUNISSEN et al., J. Invest. Dermatol, (19980000), vol. 111, pages 645 - 649 | - KURASAWA et al., Arthritis Rheum., (20000000), vol. 43, pages 2455 - 2463 | - B. OPPMANN et al., Immunity, (20000000), vol. 13, page 715 | - M. T. WIEKOWSKI et al., J Immunol, (20010000), vol. 166, page 7563 | - D.M. FRUCHT, Sci STKE, (20020108), vol. 2002, no. 114, page PE1 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F. et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - ALTSCHUL et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - SMITH et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19810000), vol. 147, pages 195 - 197 | - FLOWER, D.R. et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20000000), vol. 1482, pages 337 - 350 | - MALLAT, Z. et al., Circulation, (20010000), vol. 104, pages 1598 - 603 | - HELLINGS, P. W. et al., Am. J. Resp. Cell Mol. Biol., (20030000), vol. 28, pages 42 - 50 | - MATUSEVICIUS, D. et al., Multiple Sclerosis, (19990000), vol. 5, pages 101 - 104 | - ZIOLKOVVSKA, M. et al., J. Immunol., (20000000), vol. 164, pages 2832 - 38 | - KOTAKE, S. et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19990000), vol. 103, pages 1345 - 52 | - KOMIYAMA, Y. et al., J. Immunol., (20060000), vol. 177, pages 566 - 573 | - JOVANOVIC et al., J. Immunol, (19980000), vol. 161, pages 3513 - 3521 | - TEUNISSEN et al., J. Investig. Dermatol, (19980000), vol. 111, pages 645 - 649 | - SHALOM- BARAK et al., J. Biol Chem., (19980000), vol. 273, pages 27467 - 27473 | - ATTUR et al., Arthritis Rheum., (19970000), vol. 40, pages 1050 - 1053 | - AGGARWAL et al., J. Leukoc. Biol, (20020000), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 1 - 8 | - LUBBERTS et al., "Treatment with a neutralizing anti-murine interleukin-17 antibody after the onset of collagen-induced arthritis reduces joint inflammation, cartilage destruction, and bone erosion", Arthritis Rheum., (20040000), vol. 50, pages 650 - 659, XP002580291 | - BIASUCCI, L. et al., Circulation, (19990000), vol. 99, pages 855 - 860 | - BLANKENBERG, S. et al., Circulation, (20020000), vol. 106, pages 2595 - 30 | - BUFFON, A. et al., NEJM, (20020000), vol. 347, pages 55 - 7 | - MALLAT, Z. et al., Circ Res., (20010000), vol. 89, pages E41 - 5 | - HOLSCHER, Curr. Opin. Invest. Drugs, (20050000), vol. 6, page 489 | - LANGRISH et al., Immunol Rev., (20040000), vol. 202, page 96 | - J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 1910 - 191 | - J. Exp. Med., (20050000), vol. 201, pages 233 - 240 | - STARNES et al., "Cutting edge: IL-17F, a novel cytokine selectively expressed in activated T cells and monocytes, regulates angiogenesis and endothelial cell cytokine production", J. Immunol., (20010000), vol. 167, pages 4137 - 4140, XP001206023 | - PARK et al., Immunol, (20050000), vol. 6, page 1133 | - CHEN et al., J Clin Invest., (20060000), vol. 116, page 1317 | - KONIG, T.SKERRA, A., J. Immunol. Methods, (19980000), vol. 218, pages 73 - 83 | - SCHLEHUBER, S.SKERRA, A., "Duocalins, engineered ligand-binding proteins with dual specificity derived from the lipocalin fold", Biol. Chem., (20010000), vol. 382, doi:10.1515/BC.2001.166, pages 1335 - 1342, XP001078830 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/BC.2001.166 | - PERVAIZ, S.BREW, K., FASEB J., (19870000), vol. 1, pages 209 - 214 | - FLOWER, D.R., Biochem. J., (19960000), vol. 318, pages 1 - 14 | - SCHMIDT, T.G.M. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 255, pages 753 - 766 | - VAJODUCKWORTH, Pharmacol. Rev., (20000000), vol. 52, pages 1 - 9 | - DENNIS, M. S.ZHANG, M.MENG, Y. G.KADKHODAYAN, M.KIRCHHOFER, D.COMBS, D.DAMICO, L. A., J Biol Chem, (20020000), vol. 277, pages 35035 - 35043 | - OSBORN, B.L. et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (20020000), vol. 303, pages 540 - 548 | - FUERTGES et al., "The Clinical Efficacy of Poly(Ethylene Glycol)-Modified Proteins J", Control. Release, (19900000), vol. 11, doi:10.1016/0168-3659(90)90127-F, pages 139 - 148, XP023744014 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-3659(90)90127-F | - LOWMAN, H.B., Annu. Rev. Biophys. Biomol. Struct., (19970000), vol. 26, pages 401 - 424 | - RODI, D.J.MAKOWSKI, L., Curr. Opin. Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 10, pages 87 - 93 | - VENTURI et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20020000), vol. 315, pages 1 - 8 | - BRUCKDORFER, T. et al., Curr. Pharm. Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 5, pages 29 - 43 | - III. et al., "Design and construction of a hybrid immunoglobulin domain with properties of both heavy and light chain variable regions", Protein Eng, (19970000), vol. 10, pages 949 - 57 | - MARTIN et al., "The affinity-selection of a minibody polypeptide inhibitor of human interleukin-6", EMBO J, (19940000), vol. 13, pages 5303 - 9, XP002076260 | - HOLLIGER et al., "Diabodies': small bivalent and bispecific antibody fragments", PNAS USA, (19930000), vol. 90, doi:10.1073/pnas.90.14.6444, pages 6444 - 6448, XP002008022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.90.14.6444 | - TRAUNECKER et al., "Bispecific single chain molecules (Janusins) target cytotoxic lymphocytes on HIV infected cells", EMBO J, (19910000), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659, XP000232579 | - TRAUNECKER et al., "Janusin: new molecular design for bispecific reagents", Int J Cancer, (19920000), pages 51 - 52, XP009171574 | - SILVERMAN, LU QBAKKER ATO WDUGUAY AALBA BMSMITH RRIVAS ALI PLE HWHITEHORN E, Nat Biotech, (20051200), vol. 23, no. 12, pages 1556 - 61 | - SILVERMAN JLU QBAKKER ATO WDUGUAY AALBA BMSMITH RRIVAS ALI PLE H, Nat Biotech, vol. 23, no. 12, pages 1556 - 61 |