EP3767259 - SENSOR OR DETECTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Niko NV Industriepark West 40 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOREMAN, Tom Putstraat 12 9310 Meldert (Aalst) / BE | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Winger Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | [2023/38] |
Former [2021/03] | DenK iP bv Hundelgemsesteenweg 1116 9820 Merelbeke / BE | Application number, filing date | 20185724.0 | 14.07.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | BE20190005457 | 16.07.2019 Original published format: BE 201905457 | [2021/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767259 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3767259 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01J5/02, G01J5/08, G01J5/05, G01J5/07 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G01J5/0205 (EP);
G01J5/05 (EP);
G01J5/07 (EP);
G01J5/0806 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/03] | G01J5/02, G01J5/04, G01J5/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SENSOR ODER DETEKTORVORRICHTUNG | [2021/03] | English: | SENSOR OR DETECTOR DEVICE | [2021/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAPTEUR OU DE DÉTECTEUR | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 16.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4459484 (TAR DOMOKOS [CH]) [A] 8* column 4, lines 14-17; figure 1 *; | [XA]US6222191 (MYRON DOUGLAS D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8 * column 3, line 12; figure 2 * [A] 6; | [A]EP2533026 (GERARD LIGHTING PTY LTD [AU]) [A] 7 * paragraphs [0021] - [0026]; figure 6 *; | [XAI]US2016334279 (MITTLEMAN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraphs [0017] - [0021]; figures 2a,2b,2c,2d * [A] 6 [I] 7-9,11,12 |