EP3742507 - CROSS-POINT MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/48] | CROSS-POINT MEMORY AND METHODS FOR FABRICATION OF SAME | ||
[2022/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way, P.O. Box 6 Boise, ID 83707 / US | [2020/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAVASIO, Marcello c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | 02 /
SCIARRILLO, Samuele c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | 03 /
PELLIZZER, Fabio c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | 04 /
TORTORELLI, Innocenzo c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | 05 /
SOMASCHINI, Roberto c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | 06 /
CASELLATO, Cristina c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | 07 /
MOTTADELLI, Riccardo c/o Micron Technology, Inc. 8000 South Federal Way P.O. Box 6 Boise, Idaho 83707 / US | [2020/48] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/01] |
Former [2020/48] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 20185833.9 | 09.02.2015 | [2020/48] | Priority number, date | US201414189490 | 25.02.2014 Original published format: US201414189490 | [2020/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3742507 | Date: | 25.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3742507 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L45/00, H01L27/24 | [2020/48] | CPC: |
H10B63/24 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/011 (KR);
H10B63/80 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/063 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/20 (EP);
H10N70/231 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/801 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/826 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/8828 (EP,KR,US);
H10N70/8833 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] | Title | German: | KREUZPUNKTSPEICHER | [2022/31] | English: | CROSS-POINT MEMORY | [2022/31] | French: | MÉMOIRE À POINTS DE CROISEMENT | [2022/31] |
Former [2020/48] | KREUZPUNKTSPEICHER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2020/48] | CROSS-POINT MEMORY AND METHODS FOR FABRICATION OF SAME | ||
Former [2020/48] | MÉMOIRE À POINTS DE CROISEMENT ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | Examination procedure | 14.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 25.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15755629.1 / EP3111488 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | ES | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | IT | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | IE | 09.02.2023 | LU | 09.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 09.02.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
IE | 09.02.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
MC | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
ES | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2011227017 (YASUTAKE NOBUAKI [JP]); | [X]US2012313064 (NISHIMURA JUN [JP]); | [E]WO2015088921 (MICRON TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) | Examination | US2012235109 |