EP3767678 - IMAGE SENSOR PIXEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISORG 17 rue Soyouz 87068 Limoges Cedex 3 / FR | [2021/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPOIRON, Camille c/o ISORG 60 Rue des Berges Parc Polytec - Immeuble Tramontane 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
BOUTHINON, Benjamin c/o ISORG 60 Rue des Berges Parc Polytec Immeuble Tramontane 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | [2021/03] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2021/03] | Application number, filing date | 20186099.6 | 16.07.2020 | [2021/03] | Priority number, date | FR20190008252 | 19.07.2019 Original published format: FR 1908252 | [2021/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3767678 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/30, H01L51/44, H04N5/369, H01L27/146 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
H01L27/14665 (EP,KR);
H01L27/14603 (EP,KR);
H01L27/14612 (CN);
H10K39/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01L27/14625 (KR);
H01L27/14627 (EP,CN);
H01L27/14645 (CN);
H01L27/14683 (CN);
H10K30/81 (EP,US);
H10K30/82 (EP,KR);
H10K30/87 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/549 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] |
Former [2021/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIXEL EINES BILDSENSORS | [2021/03] | English: | IMAGE SENSOR PIXEL | [2021/03] | French: | PIXEL DE CAPTEUR D'IMAGES | [2021/03] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 24.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE102016102111 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0193]; figure 17 * * paragraphs [0081] , [0083] , [0181] , [0197] , [0228] - [0230] * * paragraph [0161] - paragraph [0169]; figures 14,15B * [A] 5-15; | [A]EP3209012 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 6 * paragraph [0104] - paragraphs [0110] , [0116]; figures 9A,9C ** paragraphs [0049] , [0068] , [0091] *; | [A]US2017257587 (HATANO KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0176]; figure 16 * * paragraph [0078] * * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE102016102111 | EP3209012 | US2017257587 |