EP3926895 - APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR ROUTING PACKETS BETWEEN A TIME-SENSITIVE NETWORKING (TSN) NETWORK AND A NON-TSN NETWORK BY VIRTUAL LOCAL AREA NETWORK (VLAN) TAG MANIPULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.12.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moxa Inc. 13F, No. 3, Sec. 4, New Taipei Blvd. Xinzhuang Dist. New Taipei City 242 / TW | [2022/43] |
Former [2021/51] | For all designated states Moxa Inc. 4F., No.135, Ln. 235 Baoqiao Road Xindian District New Taipei City 231 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Chi-Chuan New Taipei City / TW | 02 /
LIN, Chun-Yu New Taipei City / TW | 03 /
LAI, Chien-Yu New Taipei City / TW | 04 /
LIAO, Wen-Lu New Taipei City / TW | [2021/51] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | ||
Former [2021/51] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20186165.5 | 16.07.2020 | [2021/51] | Priority number, date | US202016901224 | 15.06.2020 Original published format: US202016901224 | [2021/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3926895 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3926895 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2022/49] | CPC: |
H04L12/4625 (EP);
H04L12/4641 (CN);
H04L12/4645 (US);
H04L12/4633 (CN,US);
H04L12/4666 (EP);
H04L12/4679 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | H04L12/46, H04L12/717, H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/51] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMITTLUNG VON PAKETEN ZWISCHEN EINEM NETZWERK MIT ZEITSENSITIVER VERNETZUNG (TSN) UND EINEM NICHT-TSN-NETZWERK DURCH ETIKETTENMANIPULATION EINES VIRTUELLEN LOKALEN NETZWERKS (VLAN) | [2021/51] | English: | APPARATUSES AND METHODS FOR ROUTING PACKETS BETWEEN A TIME-SENSITIVE NETWORKING (TSN) NETWORK AND A NON-TSN NETWORK BY VIRTUAL LOCAL AREA NETWORK (VLAN) TAG MANIPULATION | [2021/51] | French: | APPAREILS ET PROCÉDÉS D'ACHEMINEMENT DE PAQUETS ENTRE UN RÉSEAU SENSIBLE AU TEMPS (TSN) ET UN RÉSEAU NON TSN PAR MANIPULATION D'ÉTIQUETTE DE RÉSEAU LOCAL VIRTUEL (VLAN) | [2021/51] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/51] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 16.07.2023 | CH | 31.07.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
CH | 31.07.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | GR | 08.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2020098917 (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [X] 1,3,7,9,10,12,16 * page 7, line 11 - line 13; figures 1-7 * * page 7, line 19 - line 22 * * page 7, line 30 - line 31 * * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 1 * * page 9, line 19 - line 22 * * page 11, line 11 - line 21 * * page 12, line 27 - page 13, line 3 * [Y] 8,17 [I] 2,4-6,11,13-15; | [YA] - Tsn Task Group, "Bridges and Bridged Networks Amendment: Stream Reservation Protocol (SRP) Enhancements and Performance Improvements", (20170324), URL: grouper.ieee.org/groups/802/1/files/private/cc-drafts/d1/802-1Qcc-d1-4.pdf, (20201104), XP055746925 [Y] 8,17 * the whole document * [A] 1-7,9-16 | [A] - GERHARD TIM ET AL, "Software-defined Flow Reservation: Configuring IEEE 802.1Q Time-Sensitive Networks by the Use of Software-Defined Networking", 2019 24TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMERGING TECHNOLOGIES AND FACTORY AUTOMATION (ETFA), IEEE, (20190910), doi:10.1109/ETFA.2019.8869040, pages 216 - 223, XP033633461 [A] 1-17 * page 2 - page 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ETFA.2019.8869040 |