EP3939495 - BIOSIGNAL MONITORING SYSTEM WITH MOTION ARTIFACT REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states Stichting IMEC Nederland High Tech Campus 31 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2022/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Wegberg, Roland 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Van Helleputte, Nick 3001 Leuven / BE | [2024/23] |
Former [2022/03] | 01 /
Van Wegberg, Mr. Roland 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
02 /
Van Helleputte, Mr. Nick 3001 Leuven / BE | Representative(s) | Patent Department IMEC IMEC vzw Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2022/03] | Application number, filing date | 20186267.9 | 16.07.2020 | [2022/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3939495 | Date: | 19.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, H03F1/34 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/7214 (EP);
A61B5/7207 (US);
A61B5/30 (EP);
A61B5/308 (US);
A61B5/31 (US);
A61B5/313 (US);
A61B5/7225 (EP,US);
A61B5/725 (EP);
H03F1/34 (EP);
H03F3/45475 (EP);
H03F2200/261 (EP);
H03F2203/45138 (EP);
H03F2203/45521 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] |
Former [2022/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOSIGNALÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT BEWEGUNGSARTEFAKTREDUKTION | [2022/03] | English: | BIOSIGNAL MONITORING SYSTEM WITH MOTION ARTIFACT REDUCTION | [2022/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE BIOSIGNAL AVEC RÉDUCTION DES ARTÉFACTS DE MOUVEMENT | [2022/03] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 11.07.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013116577 (YAZICIOGLU REFET FIRAT [BE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]EP2819306 (IMEC [BE]) [Y] 1-15 * figure 2 ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0049] * |