Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.02.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.02.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.06.2021 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
04.06.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 | Change - designated states | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
15.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.10.2020 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
20.07.2020 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
18.07.2020 | Change - representative |