Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016160659 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9793543 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2017 | B2 | US2015280250 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9793542 | Global Dossier | 17.10.2017 | B2 | US2015280234 | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514625876 | 19.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11901553 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2024 | B2 | US2022209233 | 30.06.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201715785346 | 16.10.2017 | US201816222087 | 17.12.2018 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | US202217698670 | 18.03.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11799082 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2023 | B2 | US2021367237 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201916397590 | 29.04.2019 | US201715785326 | 16.10.2017 | US201514625876 | 19.02.2015 | US202117393084 | 03.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11316159 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2022 | B2 | US2019123351 | 25.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201715785346 | 16.10.2017 | US201816222087 | 17.12.2018 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11081696 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2021 | B2 | US2019252683 | 15.08.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201916397590 | 29.04.2019 | US201715785326 | 16.10.2017 | US201514625876 | 19.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10276869 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2019 | B2 | US2018040894 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514625876 | 19.02.2015 | US201715785326 | 16.10.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10158118 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2018 | B2 | US2018040895 | 08.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201715785346 | 16.10.2017 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7101725B | Global Dossier | 15.07.2022 | B2 | JP2020174050 | 22.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6731419B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2020 | B2 | JP2018510479 | 12.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | WO2016US24436 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6740209B | Global Dossier | 12.08.2020 | B2 | JP2017510968 | 13.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US21381 | 19.03.2015 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3503261 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2020 | B1 | EP3503261 | 26.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US21381 | 19.03.2015 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | EP15717992 | 19.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3278385 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | WO2016US24436 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3123541 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B1 | EP3123541 | 01.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US21381 | 19.03.2015 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110911633B | Global Dossier | 21.06.2024 | B | CN110911633 | 24.03.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US21381 | 19.03.2015 | CN201911250482 | 19.03.2015 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | CN201580016736 | 19.03.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107438916 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | WO2016US24436 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106463694B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2020 | B | CN106463694 | 30.06.2017 | A8 | CN106463694 | 22.02.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2015US21381 | 19.03.2015 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2024201197 | Global Dossier | 14.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2024201197 | 22.02.2024 | AU2016243545 | 28.03.2016 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | AU2021258092 | 29.10.2021 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | WO2016US24436 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021258092B | Global Dossier | 23.11.2023 | B2 | AU2021258092 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2016243545 | 28.03.2016 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | AU2021258092 | 29.10.2021 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | WO2016US24436 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2016243545B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | B2 | AU2016243545 | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | US201514672303 | 30.03.2015 | WO2016US24436 | 28.03.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3745497 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2015US21381 | 19.03.2015 | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | EP15717992 | 19.03.2015 | EP18211331 | 19.03.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015148245 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7051943B | Global Dossier | 11.04.2022 | B2 | JP2020181825 | 05.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461971667 | 28.03.2014 | Type | Earlier application | EP3123541 | EP3503261 |