EP3770125 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF GLASS STRIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/04] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF GLASS STRIPS | ||
[2021/10] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstraße 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states SCHOTT AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GLACKI, Alexander Bertha-von-Suttner-Platz 23 30173 Hannover / DE | 02 /
BREITBACH, Christian Felsingstrasse 21 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
HUNNIUS, Holger Am Jugendwerk 11 55122 Mainz / DE | 04 /
LANGE, Ulrich Rektor-Forestier-Strasse 7 55122 Mainz / DE | 05 /
MÜNCH, Wolfgang Dr.-Fritz-Bockius-Str. 10 a 55270 Bubenheim / DE | 06 /
RÖSEL, Gregor Friedrichstr. 3 65462 Ginsheim-Gustavsburg / DE | 07 /
WEGENER, Holger Glenetalstrasse 56 31061 Alfeld / DE | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 20186541.7 | 17.07.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | DE201910120064 | 24.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019120064 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770125 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3770125 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C03B17/06, C03B7/098 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C03B17/06 (EP,CN);
C03B17/067 (KR,US);
C03B17/061 (US);
C03B17/064 (CN);
C03B17/068 (US);
C03B7/094 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLASBÄNDERN | [2021/04] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF GLASS STRIPS | [2024/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE RUBANS DE VERRE | [2021/04] |
Former [2021/04] | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF GLASS STRIPS | Examination procedure | 17.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/16] | 17.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24167271.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]DE1596484 (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN [DE]) | by applicant | DE10064977 | DE102004007560 |