EP3778453 - PAPER SHEET PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Horizon International Inc. 1601, Aza Shironoshita Asahi Shinasahi-cho Takashima-shi, Shiga 520-1501 / JP | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakimoto, Shigeru c/o Horizon Inc., 1600, Asahi, Shin Asahi-cho Takashima-shi, Shiga 520-1501 / JP | 02 /
Okamoto, Kohei c/o Horizon Inc., 1600, Asahi, Shin Asahi-cho Takashima-shi, 520-1501 / JP | 03 /
Otani, Hiroto c/o Horizon Inc., 1600, Asahi, Shin Asahi-cho Takashima-shi, 520-1501 / JP | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Liedtke & Partner Patentanwälte Gerhart-Hauptmann-Straße 10/11 99096 Erfurt / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20186915.3 | 21.07.2020 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | JP20190145541 | 07.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019145541 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778453 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778453 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B42C19/08, B65H31/34, B65H31/30, B65H43/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
B65H31/3081 (EP);
B65H3/00 (CN);
B42B4/00 (US);
B42C19/02 (US);
B42C19/08 (EP);
B65H1/04 (CN);
B65H31/3045 (EP);
B65H31/34 (EP);
B65H37/04 (CN);
B65H37/06 (CN);
B65H43/00 (EP);
B65H45/142 (US);
B65H45/18 (US);
B65H45/22 (US);
B65H7/04 (CN);
B65H2301/321 (EP);
B65H2301/4223 (EP);
B65H2301/4493 (EP);
B65H2404/2614 (US);
B65H2404/311 (EP);
B65H2511/12 (EP);
B65H2511/13 (EP,US);
B65H2511/15 (EP);
B65H2511/224 (US);
B65H2511/51 (EP);
B65H2511/515 (EP);
B65H2553/43 (EP);
B65H2557/23 (EP);
B65H2557/63 (EP);
B65H2557/64 (EP);
B65H2701/1131 (CN);
B65H2701/182 (EP);
B65H2701/1932 (EP);
B65H2801/48 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B65H2511/12, B65H2220/03 (EP);
B65H2511/13, B65H2220/03 (EP);
B65H2511/15, B65H2220/03 (EP);
B65H2511/515, B65H2220/03 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/07] | B65H7/02, B65H43/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PAPIERBLATTVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | PAPER SHEET PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2021/07] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE FEUILLE DE PAPIER | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 12.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 12.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3899165 (ABRAM STEWART J, et al); | [X]US4168828 (MCLEAR JAMES A) | Examination | US10273109 | by applicant | WO2018025464 | WO2018207335 |