EP3770506 - FURNACE WITH VERTICALLY MOVABLE BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riener, Karl Stefan Schiedermayrstrasse 3 4560 Kirchdorf / AT | [2021/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2021/04] | Application number, filing date | 20187286.8 | 22.07.2020 | [2021/04] | Priority number, date | DE20191005109 | 23.07.2019 Original published format: DE102019005109 | [2021/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770506 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3770506 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F24B1/192 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
F24B1/192 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2021/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OFEN MIT VERTIKAL BEWEGBAREM BRENNRAUMTEIL | [2021/04] | English: | FURNACE WITH VERTICALLY MOVABLE BURNER | [2021/04] | French: | FOUR DOTÉ D'UNE PARTIE DE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION MOBILE VERTICALEMENT | [2021/04] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 13.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP0067383 (AEBERHARD HANS); | [XY]FR2692969 (ARTIMAT [FR]); | [Y]DE202015105434U (BRUNS GMBH GEB [DE]); | [XYI]DE202017002555U (BILLER RUDI [DE], et al) | Examination | US3994274 |