EP3785984 - SEAT FRAME FOR VEHICLE SEAT ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 29.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aguti Produktentwicklung & Design GmbH Bildstock 18/3 88085 Langenargen / DE | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rogg, Christian Hengnau 90 88142 Wasserburg / DE | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 20187294.2 | 23.07.2020 | [2021/09] | Priority number, date | DE201910122979 | 27.08.2019 Original published format: DE102019122979 | [2021/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785984 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3785984 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/68, B60N2/32, B60P3/36 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
B60N2/68 (EP);
B60N2/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] |
Former [2021/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SITZGESTELL FÜR EINE FAHRZEUGSITZANORDNUNG | [2021/09] | English: | SEAT FRAME FOR VEHICLE SEAT ASSEMBLY | [2021/09] | French: | CHÂSSIS DE SIÈGE POUR UN AGENCEMENT DE SIÈGE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/09] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 20.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | ES | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
ES | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH08132939 (OTEC JAPAN KK) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * abstract * [Y] 4,8-10 [I] 7; | [XYI]US2001040400 (KAMIDA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,11 * paragraphs [0040] - [0082]; figures 1-10 * [Y] 4,8-10 [I] 4,7,8; | [Y]FR2871746 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [Y] 4,8* page 3, line 16 - page 5, line 34; figures 1-4 *; | [I]CN108741872 (FUNAN RUNYANG HOME FURNISHING CO LTD) [I] 1,5-7,11 * figures 1-4 *; | [XYI]DE202018006085U (TRIGANO VDL [FR]) [X] 1-3,11 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8-10 [I] 5-7,9,10 |