EP3757994 - IMPROVED AUDIO CODING SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING SPECTRAL COMPONENT COUPLING AND SPECTRAL COMPONENT REGENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Robert L. c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | 02 /
TRUMAN, Michael M. 4806 Leland Street Chevy Chase, MD 20815 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Phillip 2086 Harborview Ct. Santa Cruz, CA 95062 / US | 04 /
VERNON, Stephen D. c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2021/08] |
Former [2021/01] | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Robert L. c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | ||
02 /
TRUMAN, Michael M. 3527 Winfield Ln NW Washington, DC 20007 / US | |||
03 /
WILLIAMS, Phillip Santa Cruz Santa Cruz, CA 95061 / US | |||
04 /
VERNON, Stephen D. c/o Dolby Laboratories, Inc. 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | Representative(s) | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/01] | Dolby International AB Patent Group Europe Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Application number, filing date | 20187378.3 | 30.04.2004 | [2021/01] | Priority number, date | US200343444903 | 08.05.2003 Original published format: US 43444903 | [2021/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3757994 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3757994 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G10L21/038, G10L19/02 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
G10L21/038 (EP,KR,US);
G10L21/02 (BR);
G10L19/02 (EP,BR,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/31] |
Former [2021/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE AUDIOCODIERUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SPEKTRALKOMPONENTENKOPPLUNG UND SPEKTRALKOMPONENTENREGENERATION | [2021/01] | English: | IMPROVED AUDIO CODING SYSTEMS AND METHODS USING SPECTRAL COMPONENT COUPLING AND SPECTRAL COMPONENT REGENERATION | [2021/01] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE CODAGE AUDIO AMÉLIORÉ ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT UN COUPLAGE DE COMPOSANTS SPECTRAUX ET RÉGÉNÉRATION DE COMPOSANTE SPECTRALE | [2021/01] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04750889.0 / EP1620845 | EP16169329.6 / EP3093844 | Divisional application(s) | EP22160456.4 / EP4057282 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.04.2004 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | IE | 30.04.2022 | LU | 30.04.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/20] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CY | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9857436 (LILJERYD LARS GUSTAF [SE], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A] - DIETZ M ET AL, "Spectral Band Replication, a Novel Approach in Audio Coding", AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY CONVENTION PAPER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020510), pages 1 - 8, XP002376876 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - Yasheng Qian ET AL, "WIDEBAND SPEECH RECOVERY FROM NARROWBAND SPEECH USING CLASSIFIED CODEBOOK MAPPING", Proceedings of the 9th Australian International Conference on Speech Science & Technology Melbourne., (20021205), pages 106 - 111, URL: http://kom.aau.dk/group/04gr742/Diverse doks/Wideband speech recovery from narrowband speech using classified codebook mapping.pdf, (20131018), XP055084555 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - KRISTOFER KJÖRLING, "Technical Description of Coding Technologies' Proposal for MPEG-4 v3 General Audio Bandwidth Extension: Spectral Band Replication (SBR)", no. M7943; m7943, (20020305), 59. MPEG MEETING; 20020311 - 20020315; JEJU; (MOTION PICTURE EXPERT GROUP OR ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11),, URL: http://phenix.int-evry.fr/mpeg/doc_end_user/documents/59_Jeju/contrib/m7943.zip Technical description of Coding Technologies proposal.doc, (20100827), XP030037009 [A] 1-11 * page 43, paragraph 7.3 - page 44, paragraph 7.5 * | by applicant | - "Digital Audio Compression (AC-3", Advanced Television Systems Committee (ATSC) Standard document A/52 | - PRINCEN et al., "Subband/Transform Coding Using Filter Bank Designs Based on Time Domain Aliasing Cancellation", Proc. of the International Conf. onAcoust., Speech and Signal Proc., (19870500), pages 2161 - 64 | US20020113858 |