EP3944672 - METHOD AND DEVICES FOR OPTIMIZED USAGE OF HOTSPOTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.12.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2022/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidemann, Cornelius 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | [2022/04] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Elisabethenstrasse 11 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/04] | Application number, filing date | 20187704.0 | 24.07.2020 | [2022/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3944672 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/10, H04W48/16, // H04W48/18, H04W48/12, H04W48/20, H04W84/12 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
H04W48/10 (EP);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W48/20 (EP);
H04W84/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] |
Former [2022/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR OPTIMIERTEN NUTZUNG VON HOTSPOTS | [2022/04] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICES FOR OPTIMIZED USAGE OF HOTSPOTS | [2022/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIFS POUR OPTIMISER L'UTILISATION DE POINTS D'ACCÈS | [2022/04] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 21.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003139197 (KOSTIC ZORAN [US], et al); | [X]US2006223527 (LEE YUI-WAH [US], et al); | [Y]US2009175250 (MATHUR SAURABH [US], et al); | [X]US2015282063 (PATIL ABHISHEK PRAMOD [US], et al); | [XAYI]US2018324886 (JUNG BU-SEOP [KR], et al) | by applicant | US2011013569 |