EP3778521 - ACCELERATOR MIXTURE FOR PEROXIDE CURING AGENTS AND TWO-COMPONENT MORTAR SYSTEM CONTAINING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.01.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstr. 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bürgel, Thomas Ummendorfer Feld 15 86899 Landsberg / DE | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 20187910.3 | 07.03.2012 | [2021/07] | Priority number, date | DE20111017619 | 27.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011017619 | [2021/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778521 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C04B24/12, C04B26/02, C04B40/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C04B24/121 (EP,RU,US);
C07B63/04 (RU);
B01J31/0237 (US);
C04B24/12 (RU);
C04B24/122 (EP,RU,US);
C04B26/02 (EP,RU,US);
C04B40/00 (RU);
C04B40/0039 (EP,US);
C08K5/16 (RU);
E21B23/00 (US);
E21B23/01 (RU);
E21D21/00 (RU);
| C-Set: |
C04B26/02, C04B22/068, C04B24/121, C04B24/122, C04B40/065 (US,EP);
C04B40/0039, C04B24/121, C04B24/122 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] |
Former [2021/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGERMISCHUNG FÜR PEROXIDHÄRTER UND DIESE ENTHALTENDES ZWEIKOMPONENTEN-MÖRTELSYSTEM | [2021/07] | English: | ACCELERATOR MIXTURE FOR PEROXIDE CURING AGENTS AND TWO-COMPONENT MORTAR SYSTEM CONTAINING THE SAME | [2021/07] | French: | MÉLANGE ACCÉLÉRATEUR POUR DURCISSEUR DE PEROXYDE ET SYSTÈME DE MORTIER À DEUX COMPOSANTS COMPORTANT CELUI-CI | [2021/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 17.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12158409.8 / EP2518033 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4666978 (STOREY ROBSON F [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0650942 (UPAT MAX LANGENSIEPEN KG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * examples 2,3 *; | [A]CN1418909 (XIONG LIQUN [CN]) [A] 1-16 * example 3 *; | [A]DE102006030044 (FISCHER ARTUR WERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0013] *; | [AD]EP1935860 (HILTI AG [LI]) [AD] 1-16* the whole document * | by applicant | US3297745 | US3772404 | US4618658 | DE3744390 | GB2217722 | DE4131457 | DE4231161 | DE19531649 | DE19956509 | EP1935860 | WO2010108939 | US2011071234 | - M. MALIK et al., J. M. S. - Rev. Macromol. Chem. Phys., (20000000), vol. C40, no. 2 and 3, pages 139 - 165 |