EP3749025 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A WIRELESS DEVICE TO RECEIVE DATA IN AN ECO STATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.11.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2020/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Au, Kelvin Kar Kin 233 Tandalee Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2M 0A2 / CA | 02 /
Zhang, Liqing 19 Brookstone Street Ottawa, Ontario K2G 6T6 / CA | 03 /
Ma, Jianglei 3 Bon Echo Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2M 2W5 / CA | [2020/50] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/50] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20188040.8 | 26.01.2016 | [2020/50] | Priority number, date | US201514609707 | 30.01.2015 Original published format: US201514609707 | [2020/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3749025 | Date: | 09.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, // H04W68/00, H04W36/00 | [2020/50] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W52/0209 (KR,US);
H04W52/0225 (CN);
H04W52/0258 (EP,CN);
H04W52/283 (CN);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W68/005 (KR);
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/50] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EINE DRAHTLOSE EINRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN VON DATEN IN EINEM ÖKOSTATUS | [2020/50] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR A WIRELESS DEVICE TO RECEIVE DATA IN AN ECO STATE | [2020/50] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISPOSITIF SANS FIL POUR RECEVOIR DES DONNÉES DANS UN ÉTAT ÉCO | [2020/50] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/50] | 01.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16742748.3 / EP3243348 | EP19154658.9 / EP3515128 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2009109907 (TSAI SHIAU-HE SHAWN [SE], et al) [Y] 2,8 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * [A] 1,3-7,9-15; | [YA]US2012307660 (LINDOFF BENGT [SE], et al) [Y] 5,6,10,11 * figures 4a-4c * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0054] *[A] 1-4,7-9,12-15; | [XYI]US2014112229 (MERLIN SIMONE [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7,9,13-15 * figures 9, 11 * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0142] * [Y] 2,5,6,8,10,11 [I] 12 |