Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024097754 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US202318506071 | 09.11.2023 | US202117222744 | 05.04.2021 | US201916684385 | 14.11.2019 | US202218046426 | 13.10.2022 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11817925 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2023 | B2 | US2023118549 | 20.04.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US202117222744 | 05.04.2021 | US201916684385 | 14.11.2019 | US202218046426 | 13.10.2022 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11483040 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2021234585 | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US202117222744 | 05.04.2021 | US201916684385 | 14.11.2019 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10972161 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | B2 | US2020083937 | 12.03.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US201916684385 | 14.11.2019 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102442249B | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | B1 | KR20210122912 | 12.10.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | KR20187030798 | 19.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | WO2017KR04191 | 19.04.2017 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102310164B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2021 | B1 | KR20180127447 | 28.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | WO2017KR04191 | 19.04.2017 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3427405 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2020 | B1 | EP3427405 | 10.04.2019 | A4 | EP3427405 | 16.01.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | WO2017KR04191 | 19.04.2017 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109075849B | Global Dossier | 05.04.2022 | B | CN109075849 | 21.12.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | WO2017KR04191 | 19.04.2017 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3748866 | Global Dossier | 21.12.2022 | B1 | EP3748866 | 09.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | EP17786173 | 19.04.2017 | WO2017KR04191 | 19.04.2017 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017183905 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2018 | A3 | WO2017183905 | 26.10.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10659118 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2020 | B2 | US2017302353 | 19.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2936650T | 21.03.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201662353781 | 23.06.2016 | US201715490561 | 18.04.2017 | US201662324604 | 19.04.2016 | US201662377711 | 22.08.2016 | US201662378578 | 23.08.2016 | US201662351465 | 17.06.2016 | Type | Earlier application | EP3427405 |